Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471351

EP3471351 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACQUIRING PATH INFORMATION ABOUT DATA PACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHOU, Xingwang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LI, Feng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / LI, Jin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / ZHU, Xia
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
05 / LI, Congjuan
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17826954.410.07.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN92387
Priority number, dateCN20161054790612.07.2016         Original published format: CN201610547906
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018010618
Date:18.01.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471351
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/721, H04L12/733, // H04L12/727, H04L12/801
[2019/21]
Former International [2019/16]H04L12/721
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VON KONTEXTINFORMATIONEN ÜBER DATENPAKETE[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACQUIRING PATH INFORMATION ABOUT DATA PACKET[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ACQUISITION D'INFORMATIONS DE TRAJET CONCERNANT UN PAQUET DE DONNÉES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2016127219  (AKHAVAIN MOHAMMADI MEHDI ARASHMID [CA], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0039]; figures 3, 4, 5 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044] * [Y] 2,3,6,10,11,14 [I] 4,5,7,8,12,13,15;
 [Y]US8155126  (MAO ZHUOQING MORLEY [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,6,10,11,14 * page 7, column 2 *
International search[X]CN101479998  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * , description, page 1, lines 21-24, page 3, lines 12-23 and page 4, line 10 to page 5, line 20, and figures 4-5 *;
 [A]CN101572649  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008205292  (DENBY LORRAINE [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *