Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471429

EP3471429 - MICROPHONE UNIT AND NOISE REDUCTION DEVICE USING SAME, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYASHI, Yoshiyuki
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property
Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17827575.610.07.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP25090
Priority number, dateJP2016013985015.07.2016         Original published format: JP 2016139850
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018012448
Date:18.01.2018
Language:JA
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471429
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04R3/00, H04R1/02, B60R11/02, G10K11/178, // H04R19/04
[2019/28]
Former International [2019/16]H04R1/02, B60R11/02, G10K11/178, H04R3/00, H04R19/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:MIKROFONEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR RAUSCHVERMINDERUNG DAMIT SOWIE INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGSKOMPONENTE[2019/16]
English:MICROPHONE UNIT AND NOISE REDUCTION DEVICE USING SAME, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT COMPONENT[2019/16]
French:UNITÉ DE MICROPHONE, DISPOSITIF DE RÉDUCTION DE BRUIT UTILISANT LEDIT MICROPHONE, ET COMPOSANT DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1990611  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] - [0082] , [0089]; figure 1 *;
 [X]JP2007114239  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2011222698  (ASAO YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0053] - [0055] - [0085] - [0095]; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]WO2012166386  (CIRRUS LOGIC INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024]; figures 4-5 *;
 [A]US2016139702  (FRANKLIN JEREMY C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0055] , [0068] - [0070] - [0091] , [0092]; figure 7 *
International search[XA]WO2007100015  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3, 10 * , paragraph [0059]; fig. 11 & US 2009/0267168 A1 paragraphs [0124] to [0126]; fig. 11 * [A] 4-9;
 [XA]JP2007114239  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 1, 4 * , paragraph [0017]; fig. 2 (Family: none) * [A] 2-3, 5-10;
 [A]JP2011191383  (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0083] to [0087]; fig. 7 & US 2011/0222698 A1 paragraphs [0084] to [0090]; fig. 7 *;
 [A]JP2007047367  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0010] & US 2007/0038441 A1 paragraphs [0010] to [0011] *;
 [A]JP2014519624  (Cirrus Logic, Inc.) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0018] & US 2012/0140943 A1 paragraphs [0024] to [0027] *;
 [A]JP2004156227  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH0895581  (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2009135777  (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1-10 * , paragraph [0023] & US 2009/0161886 A1 paragraph [0025] *