Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3481317

EP3481317 - BI-POLAR TISSUE ABLATION DEVICE AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
13.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Retrovascular, Inc.
5976 W. Las Positas Boulevard, Suite 120
Pleasanton, CA 94588-8506 / US
[2019/20]
Inventor(s)01 / OGATA, Wayne
1121 Stoney Creek Drive
San Ramon, CA 94582 / US
02 / MEYER, Steven
4973 Harbord Drive
Oakland, CA 94618 / US
03 / GU, Xiang
815 Sea Spray Lane 208
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
 [2019/20]
Representative(s)Savi, Massimiliano , et al
NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[2019/20]
Application number, filing date17828309.911.07.2017
[2019/20]
WO2017US41541
Priority number, dateUS201662360911P11.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662360911 P
[2019/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018013570
Date:18.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3481317
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/18
[2019/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
TitleGerman:BIPOLARE GEWEBEABLATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/20]
English:BI-POLAR TISSUE ABLATION DEVICE AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF[2019/20]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ABLATION DE TISSU BIPOLAIRE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS[2019/20]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2019National basic fee paid 
28.01.2019Search fee paid 
28.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
02.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2005096647  (STEINKE TOM A [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 11, 13-16, 20 * fig 2, 17, para [0076], [0080], [0101], [0105], claim 40 * [Y] 12;
 [XY]US2012157993  (JENSON MARK L [US], et al) [X] 1, 4, 6, 9, 13, 17 * fig 8, 9, para [0082]-[0084] * [Y] 12;
 [X]US2011077644  (PHAM FRANCIS [US], et al) [X] 1, 5-8, 10, 13, 18-19 * fig 3, 4, para [0045], [0049], [0053] *;
 [A]US2013090651  (SMITH SCOTT R [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2002177765  (BOWE WADE A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *