blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3535776

EP3535776 - METHOD OF FABRICATING ELECTRODES, METHOD OF FABRICATING THIN FILM TRANSISTOR, METHOD OF FABRICATING ARRAY SUBSTRATE, THIN FILM TRANSISTOR, ARRAY SUBSTRATE, AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.04.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2022Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.05.2022  [2022/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd.
No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd.
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100015 / CN
For all designated states
South China University of Technology
No. 381 Wushan Road
Tianhe
Guangzhou, Guangdong 510640 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YAN, Liangchen
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
02 / XU, Xiaoguang
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
03 / LAN, Linfeng
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
04 / WANG, Lei
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
05 / PENG, Junbiao
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth
Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/37]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date17828637.330.06.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN91131
Priority number, dateCN20161093612001.11.2016         Original published format: CN201610936120
[2019/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018082327
Date:11.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3535776
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:H01L29/417, H01L27/12, H01L21/28
[2020/22]
CPC:
H01L29/41733 (EP,US); H01L21/28 (CN,US); H01L21/0273 (US);
H01L21/02107 (US); H01L21/02109 (US); H01L21/02112 (US);
H01L21/02118 (US); H01L21/0212 (US); H01L21/02642 (US);
H01L21/027 (US); H01L21/0272 (US); H01L27/124 (EP,US);
H01L27/1262 (US); H01L27/1292 (EP,US); H01L29/06 (CN);
H01L29/42384 (US); H01L29/66742 (US); H01L29/786 (CN,US);
H01L29/7869 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2019/37]H01L21/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELEKTRODEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DÜNNSCHICHTTRANSISTORS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARRAY-SUBSTRATS, DÜNNSCHICHTTRANSISTOR, ARRAY-SUBSTRAT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2019/37]
English:METHOD OF FABRICATING ELECTRODES, METHOD OF FABRICATING THIN FILM TRANSISTOR, METHOD OF FABRICATING ARRAY SUBSTRATE, THIN FILM TRANSISTOR, ARRAY SUBSTRATE, AND DISPLAY APPARATUS[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLECTRODES, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTOR À COUCHES MINCES, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRAT MATRICIEL, TRANSISTOR À COUCHES MINCES, SUBSTRAT MATRICIEL ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2018National basic fee paid 
22.01.2018Search fee paid 
22.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2018Examination requested  [2019/37]
18.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2022Application withdrawn by applicant  [2022/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006154406  (TANAKA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043]; figures 3A-C * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1A-C * [I] 5-8,11,13;
 [XI]US2008042200  (LU JHIH-PING [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032]; figures 2A-C *[I] 5-8;
 [XI]US2008054257  (TSAI HSUAN-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figures 2A-C * [I] 5-8
International search[X]US2004029382  (KAWASE TAKEO [GB]) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0030]-[0090], and figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US2006040435  (MORISUE MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009101944  (TAKASU ISAO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN102222770  (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014162287  (INDIAN INST TECHNOLOGY KANPUR [IN]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2015005568  (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-20* the whole document *
by applicantUS2004029382
 US2006154406
 US2008042200
 US2008054257
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.