Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469352

EP3469352 - METHODS FOR PERFORMING TASKS IN A TANK CONTAINING HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 05.02.2020 [2020/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tankbots, Inc.
6363 Woodway, Suite 1000
Houston, TX 77057 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MEYERS, John, W.
12 Remington Lane
Houston, TX 77005 / US
02 / DAILY, Joseph, A.
2990 Bissonnet Street
Suite 10102
Houston, TX 77005 / US
03 / CHEUVRONT, David, L.
11611 Orchard Mountain Drive
Houston, TX 77059 / US
04 / LOVELACE, James, Todd
3751 Via de la Reina
Jacksonville, FL 32217 / US
05 / GILLORY, Ronald
597 Van Molan Street
Houston, TX 77022 / US
06 / CASSIMATIS, David, John
1706 Russell Drive
Garland, TX 75040 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2020/06]
Former [2019/16]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date17829417.915.12.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US66758
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019035856
Date:21.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469352
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019
[2019/16]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3469352
Date:05.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/22, G01S17/89, G01N29/26, G01N29/265, G01N21/88, G02B23/24, H04N5/225
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON AUFGABEN IN EINEM TANK MIT GEFÄHRLICHEN STOFFEN[2019/16]
English:METHODS FOR PERFORMING TASKS IN A TANK CONTAINING HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCES[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE CONDUITE DE TÂCHES DANS UN RÉSERVOIR CONTENANT DES SUBSTANCES DANGEREUSES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2018National basic fee paid 
21.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
21.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2019Fee for grant paid
19.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010321485  (POOL LEONARD [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0061] *;
 [A]US2015148955  (CHIN HON WAH [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0051] *;
 [A]US2010307225  (YOSHIDA KENGO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 48] , [0 92] *
by applicantUS2801768
 US6452163
 US8227692
 WO2017003758
 EP2418926