Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471203

EP3471203 - ANTENNA AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Ming
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LIU, Daqing
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / WEN, Huailin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17830336.827.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN90324
Priority number, dateCN20161057815320.07.2016         Original published format: CN201610578153
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018014702
Date:25.01.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471203
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/52, H01Q1/48, H01Q1/24, H01Q5/307, H01Q1/38
[2019/29]
Former International [2019/16]H01Q1/52
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTENNE UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT[2019/16]
English:ANTENNA AND MOBILE TERMINAL[2019/16]
French:ANTENNE ET TERMINAL MOBILE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019Translation filed 
09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012194391  (LIU MING-YEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0036] *
International search[A]CN103811869  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0051]-[0053], and figures 1(a) to 2 *;
 [A]CN103155281  (MICROSOFT CORP) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN204375977U  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN103268987  (SHANGHAI AMPHENOL AIRWAVE COMM ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009135077  (KIM BYUNG-CHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2015048991  (PAJONA OLIVIER [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *