Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3538972

EP3538972 - HIGH STRENGTH HINGE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/38]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAFER, Christopher Alan
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / RAGHAVENDRA, Prasad
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/38]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/38]
Application number, filing date17832880.329.12.2017
[2019/38]
WO2017US68845
Priority number, dateUS20171540085006.01.2017         Original published format: US201715400850
[2019/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018128910
Date:12.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3538972
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, H04M1/02
[2019/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHFESTER SCHARNIERMECHANISMUS[2019/38]
English:HIGH STRENGTH HINGE MECHANISM[2019/38]
French:MÉCANISME DE CHARNIÈRE À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE[2019/38]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2019National basic fee paid 
10.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/38]
10.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011146028  (LEE CHUNG-YU [TW]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * the whole document * [I] 8;
 [XI]US2010064475  (WANG JIN-XIN [CN], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * the whole document * [I] 8;
 [XI]US2009011840  (LU CHIN CHUAN [TW]) [X] 1,4-9 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,10-15;
 [A]US2003126719  (CHEN LIN-LIN [TW]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *