blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3490482

EP3490482 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFICATION OF FIDUCIAL CORRESPONDENCE DURING IMAGE-GUIDED SURGICAL PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/23]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VERIFICATION OF FIDUCIAL CORRESPONDENCE DURING IMAGE-GUIDED SURGICAL PROCEDURES
[2023/11]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.03.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
7D Surgical ULC
60 Scarsdale Road, Unit 118
Toronto, ON M3B 2R7 / CA
[2021/42]
Former [2019/23]For all designated states
7D Surgical Inc.
60 Scarsdale Road, Unit 118
Toronto, ON M3B 2R7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / LEUNG, Michael K.K.
178 Adrian Crescent
Markham, Ontario L3P 6Z6 / CA
02 / MARIAMPILLAI, Adrian
381 Front Street West
Suite 1210
Toronto, Ontario M5V 3R8 / CA
03 / STANDISH, Beau Anthony
267 Glebemount Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M4C 3T7 / CA
04 / SIEGLER, Peter
28 Haddon Street
Toronto, Ontario M5M 3M9 / CA
05 / YANG, Victor X.D.
32 Donwoods Drive
North York, Ontario M4N 2G1 / CA
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Lecomte & Partners
76-78, rue de Merl
2146 Luxembourg / LU
[2023/36]
Former [2019/23]Lecomte & Partners
P.O. Box 1623
1016 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date17833135.107.07.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017CA50830
Priority number, dateUS201662366723P26.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662366723 P
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018018134
Date:01.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3490482
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3490482
Date:06.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA01.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61B34/20, A61B34/00, G06T7/30, G06T7/33, // A61B90/00, A61B17/00
[2023/11]
CPC:
G06T7/33 (EP); A61B90/37 (US); A61B34/00 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US); G06T7/0012 (US); G06T7/11 (US);
G06T7/30 (US); A61B2017/00725 (EP); A61B2034/2055 (EP);
A61B2034/2065 (EP,US); A61B2034/2068 (EP); A61B2090/363 (EP,US);
A61B2090/364 (EP); A61B2090/373 (EP); A61B2090/378 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (EP); G06T2207/10072 (EP); G06T2207/20101 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30004 (EP); G06T2207/30012 (US); G06V2201/033 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/35]A61B34/20, A61B34/00, G06K9/00, G06T7/30, // A61B90/00, A61B17/00
Former IPC [2019/23]A61B34/20, A61B34/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER MARKERKORRESPONDENZ WÄHREND BILDGEFÜHRTER CHIRURGISCHER VERFAHREN[2023/11]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFICATION OF FIDUCIAL CORRESPONDENCE DURING IMAGE-GUIDED SURGICAL PROCEDURES[2023/11]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À LA VÉRIFICATION DE LA CORRESPONDANCE DE REPÈRES PENDANT DES INTERVENTIONS CHIRURGICALES GUIDÉES PAR IMAGE[2023/11]
Former [2019/23]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER MARKERKORRESPONDENZ WÄHREND BILDGEFÜHRTER CHIRURGISCHER VERFAHREN
Former [2019/23]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VERIFICATION OF FIDUCIAL CORRESPONDENCE DURING IMAGE-GUIDED SURGICAL PROCEDURES
Former [2019/23]SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS SERVANT À LA VÉRIFICATION DE LA CORRESPONDANCE DE REPÈRES PENDANT DES INTERVENTIONS CHIRURGICALES GUIDÉES PAR IMAGE
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Search fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
23.02.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2023Fee for grant paid
31.07.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.09.2023
CZ06.09.2023
EE06.09.2023
ES06.09.2023
FI06.09.2023
HR06.09.2023
LT06.09.2023
LV06.09.2023
NL06.09.2023
PL06.09.2023
RO06.09.2023
RS06.09.2023
SE06.09.2023
SK06.09.2023
SM06.09.2023
NO06.12.2023
GR07.12.2023
IS06.01.2024
PT08.01.2024
[2024/25]
Former [2024/23]AT06.09.2023
CZ06.09.2023
EE06.09.2023
ES06.09.2023
FI06.09.2023
HR06.09.2023
LT06.09.2023
LV06.09.2023
NL06.09.2023
RO06.09.2023
RS06.09.2023
SE06.09.2023
SK06.09.2023
SM06.09.2023
NO06.12.2023
GR07.12.2023
IS06.01.2024
PT08.01.2024
Former [2024/20]FI06.09.2023
HR06.09.2023
LT06.09.2023
LV06.09.2023
NL06.09.2023
RS06.09.2023
SE06.09.2023
SM06.09.2023
NO06.12.2023
GR07.12.2023
IS06.01.2024
Former [2024/14]FI06.09.2023
HR06.09.2023
LT06.09.2023
LV06.09.2023
NL06.09.2023
RS06.09.2023
SE06.09.2023
NO06.12.2023
GR07.12.2023
Former [2024/10]FI06.09.2023
HR06.09.2023
LT06.09.2023
LV06.09.2023
RS06.09.2023
SE06.09.2023
NO06.12.2023
GR07.12.2023
Former [2024/09]FI06.09.2023
LT06.09.2023
SE06.09.2023
NO06.12.2023
GR07.12.2023
Former [2024/08]LT06.09.2023
NO06.12.2023
GR07.12.2023
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO2015074158  (7D SURGICAL INC [CA]) [Y] 16,17 * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 6 * * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 26 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 15 * * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 33 * * page 19, line 26 - page 20, line 28 * * page 24, lines 6-22 * * figures 2-6,8 * [A] 18-21;
 [A]US2016030131  (YANG VICTOR XIAO DONG [CA], et al) [A] 16-21 * paragraphs [0071] , [0072] , [0115] - [0119] - [0122] - [0126] - [0145] , [0151] , [0160] - [0165]; figures 1A,1B,9,10 *;
 [Y]WO2016044934  (7D SURGICAL INC [CA]) [Y] 16,17 * page 34, lines 6-14 * * page 36, line 9 - page 37, line 2 * * figures 1A,1B *;
 [A]  - BESL P J ET AL, "A METHOD FOR REGISTRATION OF 3-D SHAPES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, (19920201), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1109/34.121791, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 239 - 256, XP000248481 [A] 16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.121791
 [A]  - RUSINKIEWICZ S ET AL, "Efficient variants of the ICP algorithm", 3-D DIGITAL IMAGING AND MODELING, 2001. PROCEEDINGS. THIRD INTERNATION AL CONFERENCE ON 28 MAY - 1 JUNE 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010528), ISBN 978-0-7695-0984-6, pages 145 - 152, XP010542858 [A] 16 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2013279784  (GILL STEVEN STREATFIELD [GB], et al) [A] 0 *abstract, claims*;
 [A]US9202387  (GILBOA PINHAS [IL]) [A] 0*abstract, claims*;
 [A]CA2961079  (7D SURGICAL INC [CA]) [A] 0 *abstract, claims*
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.