Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474384

EP3474384 - POWER INTERFACE, MOBILE TERMINAL AND POWER ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd.
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan
Guangdong 523860 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Feifei
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17833252.418.04.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN80957
Priority number, dateCN201620803021U27.07.2016         Original published format: CN 201620803021 U
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018018946
Date:01.02.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474384
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN01.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/28, H01R12/70, H01R24/60, // H01R107/00
[2019/27]
Former International [2019/17]H01R13/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STROMSCHNITTSTELLE, MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND NETZTEIL[2019/17]
English:POWER INTERFACE, MOBILE TERMINAL AND POWER ADAPTER[2019/17]
French:INTERFACE DE GESTION DE L'ÉNERGIE, TERMINAL MOBILE ET ADAPTATEUR D'ALIMENTATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019Translation filed 
21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2015113340  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM [CN]) [X] 1,8,10,13-15 * abstract * [I] 2-7,9,11,12;
 [XA]CN203553401U  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [X] 1,8,10,13-15 * abstract * [A] 2-7,9,11,12;
 [A]CN105006668  (ALL BEST ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]CN203166148U  (KEEN HIGH TECHNOLOGIES LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[Y]CN203166148U  (KEEN HIGH TECHNOLOGIES LTD) [Y] 1-17 * , description, paragraphs [0014]-[0023], and figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]CN203553401U  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [Y] 1-17 * , description, paragraphs [0013]-[0015], and figures 1-3 *;
 [PX]CN106025616  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [PX] 1-17 * , description, paragraphs [0048]-[0081], and figures 1-10 *;
 [PX]CN106252924  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [PX] 1-17 * , description, paragraphs [0059]-[0110], and figures 1-10 *;
 [A]CN105006668  (ALL BEST ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , the whole document *;
 [A]JP2001210434  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-17 * , the whole document *