Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3493491

EP3493491 - PACKET FORWARDING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
04.10.2019Change - extension statespublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / PENG, Shaofu
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / WANG, Huilai
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / SUN, Jinsong
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/23]Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date17833358.920.06.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017CN89179
Priority number, dateCN20161060185227.07.2016         Original published format: CN201610601852
[2019/23]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018019054
Date:01.02.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3493491
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN01.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/721, H04L12/723, H04L12/751, H04L12/735, H04L12/707, H04L12/703, H04L12/753
[2019/28]
Former International [2019/23]H04L12/721, H04L12/723, H04L12/751
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
TitleGerman:PAKETWEITERLEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG[2019/23]
English:PACKET FORWARDING METHOD AND DEVICE[2019/23]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE PAQUET[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2019Translation filed 
28.01.2019National basic fee paid 
28.01.2019Search fee paid 
28.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - ATLAS C BOWERS JUNIPER NETWORKS G ENYEDI ERICSSON A, "An Architecture for IP/LDP Fast Reroute Using Maximally Redundant Trees (MRT-FRR); rfc7812.txt", AN ARCHITECTURE FOR IP/LDP FAST REROUTE USING MAXIMALLY REDUNDANT TREES (MRT-FRR); RFC7812.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20160617), pages 1 - 44, XP015112896 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * Section 1 Introduction; page 3 - page 5 * * Section 6.1.1 MRT LDP Labels - Section 6.1.1.4 Required Support for MRT LDP Label Options; page 10 - page 12 * * Section 7 MRT Island Formation - Section 8 MRT Profile; page 16 - page 21 * * Section 10 Inter-Area Forwarding Behaviour - Section 11 Prefixes Multiply Attached to the MRT Island; page 23 - page 31 *
 [Y]  - LI N WU HUAWEI Z, "Multi-Topology (MT) Segment in Segment Routing; draft-li-spring-multi-topology-segment-00.txt", MULTI-TOPOLOGY (MT) SEGMENT IN SEGMENT ROUTING; DRAFT-LI-SPRING-MULTI-TOPOLOGY-SEGMENT-00.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20150309), pages 1 - 5, XP015105346 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *
International search[A]CN105637807  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN105450437  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2015207671  (FARKAS JÁNOS [HU], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2015350062  (LINDEM III ALFRED C [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *