blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3492259

EP3492259 - SURFACE TREATMENT AGENT AND ARTICLE COMPRISING LAYER FORMED FROM SURFACE TREATMENT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.10.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2023New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1
Umeda, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP
[2023/03]
Former [2019/23]For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKANO, Mayuko
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP
02 / OZAWA, Kaori
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP
03 / MITSUHASHI, Hisashi
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP
04 / YAMASHITA, Tsuneo
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP
05 / NAMIKAWA, Takashi
c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD.
Umeda Center Building
4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/23]
Application number, filing date17834541.928.07.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017JP27475
Priority number, dateJP2016015032329.07.2016         Original published format: JP 2016150323
[2019/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018021539
Date:01.02.2018
Language:JA
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3492259
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:B32B27/00, C09D5/00, C09D5/08, C09D183/08, C09D183/12, C09K3/18
[2019/23]
CPC:
C09D5/1625 (EP,US); C09D183/12 (KR,US); B05D7/24 (KR);
B32B27/00 (US); C03C17/30 (US); C09D183/04 (US);
C09D183/08 (EP,KR,US); C09D183/16 (EP); C09D5/00 (KR,US);
C09D5/08 (US); C09D5/1675 (KR); C09D7/20 (KR);
C09K3/18 (US); C03C2217/76 (US); C03C2218/116 (US);
C08G77/24 (EP); C08G77/80 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
TitleGerman:OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL UND ARTIKEL MIT SCHICHT AUS DEM OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL[2019/23]
English:SURFACE TREATMENT AGENT AND ARTICLE COMPRISING LAYER FORMED FROM SURFACE TREATMENT AGENT[2019/23]
French:AGENT DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ET ARTICLE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE FORMÉE À PARTIR D'UN AGENT DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2019Translation filed 
25.01.2019National basic fee paid 
25.01.2019Search fee paid 
25.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
02.10.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4031119  (PONOMAREV ALEXEI IVANOVICH, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [XY]US5180845  (HIGLEY DAVID P [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * example 6; claim 8 * [Y] 4-6,13-15;
 [Y]EP0867441  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [Y] 4-6,13-15 * claim - *
International search[XA]US4031119  (PONOMAREV ALEXEI IVANOVICH, et al) [X] 1-6, 11, 13, 19-20 * , claims; abstract; column 1, line 30 to column 2, line 19; examples & FR 2349593 A * [A] 17-18;
 [XA]JPH07505399  (E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co.) [X] 1-6, 10-11, 13-14, 19-20 * , claims; page 2, lower left column, line 5; page 3, upper left column, line 10 to upper right column, line 15; examples & US 5180845 A claims; column 1, lines 6 to 13; column 2, line 10 to column 3, line 4; examples * [A] 17-18;
 [XYA]JPH10503795  (E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co.) [X] 1-6, 10-16, 19-20 * , claims; page 12, the last line to page 13, line 3; page 18, line 13 to page 21, line 13; page 25, lines 6 to 15; examples & US 5459198 A claims; column 2, lines 12 to 17; column 5, line 10 to column 7, line 9; examples * [Y] 7-9 [A] 17-18;
 [A]JPH10273641  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE) [A] 1-20 * , & EP 867441 A2 *;
 [Y]WO2006126511  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0002], [0115]; examples & US 2006/0293448 A1 claims; 0003, 0204; examples *;
 [XYA]JP2007025530  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-5, 7-9, 11-13,19-20 * , claims; paragraphs [0077] to [0080], [0085] to [0098]; drawings (Family: none) * [Y] 7-9 [A] 17-18;
 [A]WO2012039355  (LINTEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* , & US 2013/0244044 A1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.