blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3490765

EP3490765 - CUTTING APPARATUS EMPLOYING A MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.01.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Key Technology, Inc.
150 Avery Street
Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Robert, E.
73 Thunder Ridge Drive
Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US
02 / CARAMBOT, Kenneth, G.
84860 Highway 339
Milton-Freewater, OR 97862 / US
03 / JAUSORO, Louis, D.
113 Electric Avenue
Walla Walla, WA 99362 / US
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Schmid, Wolfgang
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2019/23]
Application number, filing date17834889.227.01.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017US15246
Priority number, dateUS20161522062827.07.2016         Original published format: US201615220628
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018022141
Date:01.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3490765
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3490765
Date:03.03.2021
Language:EN
[2021/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2020
ClassificationIPC:B26D1/42, B26D1/56, B26D5/12, B26D5/34, B26D7/08, B26D7/26, G01N21/88
[2019/23]
CPC:
B26D5/12 (EP,US); B26D1/11 (EP,US); B26D1/36 (EP,US);
B26D7/0006 (EP,US); B26D7/26 (EP,US); B26D2210/02 (EP,US);
B26D5/16 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDVORRICHTUNG MIT ANWENDUNG EINES MAGNETEN[2019/23]
English:CUTTING APPARATUS EMPLOYING A MAGNET[2019/23]
French:APPAREIL DE COUPE UTILISANT UN AIMANT[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2018National basic fee paid 
17.12.2018Search fee paid 
17.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/23]
06.05.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2021Fee for grant paid
25.01.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)06.12.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.01.2017
AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CY03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
IT03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
MK03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2024/20]HU27.01.2017
AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CY03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
IT03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2024/18]HU27.01.2017
AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
IT03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/39]AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
IT03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/23]AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
IT03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/13]AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/10]AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/08]AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/07]AL03.03.2021
AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2021/51]AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2021/50]AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2021/48]AT03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/46]AT03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/38]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SE03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/37]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/36]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/35]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
NO03.06.2021
Former [2021/33]FI03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
NO03.06.2021
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012266730  (JONES ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 7 *;
 [A]US2016136829  (CALVERT SEAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *
International search[A]US4520702  (DAVIS WALTER L [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * ; figures 7, 8; column 6, lines 20-50; column 5, lines 40-45 *;
 [A]US5029504  (WILBUR JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US5235880  (WILBUR JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US2004094010  (CHEN KUEI-JUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-24* ; entire document *;
 [X]US2012266730  (JONES ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1 * ; figures 1, 6, 7; paragraphs [0025]-[0031 ] *
by applicantUS3543035
 US3664337
 US4520702
 US6923028
 US2012266730
 US8978530
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.