blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3491096

EP3491096 - GEL-TYPE THERMAL INTERFACE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.05.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.01.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2021/24]
Former [2019/23]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Liqiang
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road
M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
02 / ZHANG, Kai
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road
M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 377
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
03 / LIU, YaQun
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road
M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
04 / SHEN, Ling
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road
M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
05 / WANG, Wei Jun
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road
M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
06 / KANG, Haigang
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road
M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Stepney, Gregory John
Withers & Rogers LLP
2 London Bridge
London SE1 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2021/24]Stepney, Gregory John
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
Former [2019/23]Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Application number, filing date17834949.411.07.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017US41447
Priority number, dateUS201662366694P26.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662366694 P
US20171564209205.07.2017         Original published format: US201715642092
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2018022288
Date:01.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3491096
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3491096
Date:16.06.2021
Language:EN
[2021/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.07.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2020
ClassificationIPC:C09K5/14, C08L83/04, H01L23/373, C08G77/26
[2020/13]
CPC:
C09K5/14 (EP,KR,US); C08K3/22 (US); C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/3737 (KR); H05K7/2039 (US); C08G77/26 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2227 (US); C08K2003/2296 (US); C08K2201/001 (US);
C08K2201/014 (US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L83/04, C08K3/22, C08K5/5419, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2019/23]C09K5/14, C08L83/04, H01L23/373
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GELARTIGES THERMISCHES ZWISCHENMATERIAL[2019/23]
English:GEL-TYPE THERMAL INTERFACE MATERIAL[2019/23]
French:MATÉRIAU D'INTERFACE THERMIQUE DU TYPE GEL[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Search fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
15.09.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.01.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.2021Fee for grant paid
05.05.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.05.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)17.03.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.07.2017
AL16.06.2021
AT16.06.2021
CY16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
MK16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SI16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
IE11.07.2021
LU11.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU11.07.2017
AL16.06.2021
AT16.06.2021
CY16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SI16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
IE11.07.2021
LU11.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2023/30]AL16.06.2021
AT16.06.2021
CY16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SI16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
IE11.07.2021
LU11.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/35]AL16.06.2021
AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SI16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
IE11.07.2021
LU11.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/34]AL16.06.2021
AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SI16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
LU11.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/29]AL16.06.2021
AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SI16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
LU11.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/26]AL16.06.2021
AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
LU11.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/24]AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
LU11.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/21]AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
DK16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/18]AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
MC16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/10]AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
EE16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
PL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
IS16.10.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/09]AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
RO16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SK16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
PT18.10.2021
Former [2022/08]AT16.06.2021
CZ16.06.2021
ES16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
Former [2022/07]AT16.06.2021
FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
NL16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
SM16.06.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
Former [2021/51]FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
RS16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
Former [2021/49]FI16.06.2021
HR16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
LV16.06.2021
SE16.06.2021
BG16.09.2021
NO16.09.2021
GR17.09.2021
Former [2021/47]FI16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
BG16.09.2021
Former [2021/46]FI16.06.2021
LT16.06.2021
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010105582  (JOFFRE ERIC JUDE [US], et al) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0170] - [0174]; claims 11-12,28 *;
 [XA]US2015307743  (IRELAND TANIA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0205]; table 2 * [A] 4-10
International search[Y]US6791839  (BHAGWAGAR DORAB EDUL [US]) [Y] 7-10 * See figure 1; column 10, lines 15-42; and claims 1-17. *;
 [A]US2007241303  (ZHONG HONG [US], et al) [A] 1-10* See claims 1, 19-22, 24, 25. *;
 [Y]WO2010104534  (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [Y] 7-10 * See page 3; claims 1, 6, 18-20; and figure 2. *;
 [XY]WO2014021980  (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-6 * See paragraphs [0001], [0052]-[0060], [0064]-[0075], [0089], [0092]; and claims 1-5. * [Y] 7-10;
 [A]US2015307743  (IRELAND TANIA [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraph [0188]; and claim 1. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.