blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3490767

EP3490767 - SCORING DEVICE AND METHODS FOR SCORING A SNOWBALL FIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.05.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.01.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moloney, Peter
1760 Sunny Slope Lane
St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/23]
Representative(s)Howe, Steven
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2019/23]
Application number, filing date17835340.528.07.2017
[2019/23]
WO2017US44377
Priority number, dateUS20161522204428.07.2016         Original published format: US201615222044
[2019/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018022996
Date:01.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3490767
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3490767
Date:08.06.2022
Language:EN
[2022/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2020
ClassificationIPC:B28B1/00, F41B3/04, B29C33/26, F41B7/08, F41B15/00, F41B3/00, A63F9/02
[2019/23]
CPC:
A63B63/00 (EP,US); A63B63/06 (EP,US); A63B71/02 (EP,US);
A63B71/0669 (EP,US); A63F11/0051 (EP,US); A63B2071/0661 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0694 (EP,US); A63B2210/50 (EP,US); A63B2220/75 (EP,US);
A63B2225/74 (EP,US); A63F2250/0407 (US); A63F2250/0414 (US);
A63F2250/0428 (US); A63F2250/49 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG EINER SCHNEEBALLSCHLACHT[2019/23]
English:SCORING DEVICE AND METHODS FOR SCORING A SNOWBALL FIGHT[2019/23]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMPTAGE DE POINTS ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMPTAGE DES POINTS D'UNE BATAILLE DE BOULES DE NEIGE[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Search fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
30.12.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.01.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2022Fee for grant paid
29.04.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.04.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)10.03.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.07.2017
AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CY08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
DK08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
IT08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
MK08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SI08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
IE28.07.2022
LU28.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG08.09.2022
GB08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
[2024/23]
Former [2024/20]HU28.07.2017
AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CY08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
DK08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
IT08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SI08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
IE28.07.2022
LU28.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG08.09.2022
GB08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2024/18]HU28.07.2017
AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
DK08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
IT08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SI08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
IE28.07.2022
LU28.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG08.09.2022
GB08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2024/11]AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
DK08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
IT08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SI08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
IE28.07.2022
LU28.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG08.09.2022
GB08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/47]AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
DK08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SI08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
IE28.07.2022
LU28.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG08.09.2022
GB08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/33]AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
DK08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SI08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
IE28.07.2022
LU28.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/25]AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
DK08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SI08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
LU28.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/21]AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
DK08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
LU28.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/17]AL08.06.2022
AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/16]AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
MC08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/12]AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
IS08.10.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/11]AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
PL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/09]AT08.06.2022
CZ08.06.2022
EE08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
RO08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
SK08.06.2022
SM08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
PT10.10.2022
Former [2023/07]AT08.06.2022
ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
Former [2023/02]ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
NL08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
Former [2022/50]ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
RS08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
Former [2022/49]ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
HR08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
LV08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
BG08.09.2022
NO08.09.2022
GR09.09.2022
Former [2022/47]ES08.06.2022
FI08.06.2022
LT08.06.2022
SE08.06.2022
NO08.09.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]US5411269  (THOMAS KEITH [US]) [A] 1-6* column 8, line 5 - column 8, line 68; figures 3a-3b *;
 [XA]US5626343  (SANDERS GARY M [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 36 - column 6, line 15; figures 2-5 * [A] 6;
 [A]US5823849  (GARDNER ROGER [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 4; figures 1,4 *
International search[XA]US5626343  (SANDERS GARY M [US]) [X] 1-7, 9 * Entire document especially col 4, In 46-47; col 5 In 8-14 and figs. 2-4 * [A] 8, 10-20;
 [A]US5819998  (CHEHEBAR JOEY [US]) [A] 1-20* Entire document *
by applicantUS5626343
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.