Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537375

EP3537375 - IMAGE SEGMENTATION METHOD, IMAGE SEGMENTATION SYSTEM AND STORAGE MEDIUM, AND DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd.
No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road
Chaoyang District
Beijing Anhui 100015 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHAO, Jibo
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
02 / TANG, Xiaojun
No.9 Dize Rd.
BDA
Beijing 100176 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17835447.806.07.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN91986
Priority number, dateCN20161090543517.10.2016         Original published format: CN201610905435
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018072483
Date:26.04.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537375
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN26.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/11
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDSEGMENTIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDSEGMENTIERUNGSSYSTEM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2019/37]
English:IMAGE SEGMENTATION METHOD, IMAGE SEGMENTATION SYSTEM AND STORAGE MEDIUM, AND DEVICE COMPRISING SAME[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SEGMENTATION D'IMAGE, SYSTÈME DE SEGMENTATION D'IMAGE ET SUPPORT DE MEMOIRE, ET DISPOSITIF LE COMPRENANT[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase05.02.2018Translation filed 
05.02.2018National basic fee paid 
05.02.2018Search fee paid 
05.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2018Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]CN104217192  (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 16, 20-22 * , description, paragraphs 0022-0023, 0037-0039 and 0048-0067, and figures 1-9 *;
 [A]CN104765440  (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * , entire document *;
 [A]CN102272773  (NOKIA CORPORATION) [A] 1-22 * , entire document *;
 [A]US8625897  (CRIMINISI ANTONIO [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * , entire document *;
 [A]  - LUO, LINGFENG et al., "Gesture Reconition Using Depth Image", ICSP2014 Proceedings, 2014 12th International Conference on, (20141023), pages 751 - 755, XP032725574 [A] 1-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICOSP.2014.7015104
 [A]  - GU, DE et al., "Hand and Finger Tracking Based on Kinect Depth Information", The 25th Chinese Process Control Conference, (20140809), pages 1 - 5, XP009517006 [A] 1-22