Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3320747

EP3320747 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR UPDATING AN UPLINK CONTENTION WINDOW SIZE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.10.2018  [2018/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JRD Communication Inc.
16/F, Block B, TCL Tower
Gaoxin Nanyi Road
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518063 / CN
[2018/20]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Guang
16/F Block B TCL Tower
Gaoxin Nanyi Road
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518063 / CN
 [2018/20]
Representative(s)Cordina, Kevin John , et al
Simmons & Simmons
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/20]CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Application number, filing date17835996.427.05.2017
[2018/20]
WO2017CN86332
Priority number, dateGB2016001351205.08.2016         Original published format: GB 201613512
[2018/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018024022
Date:08.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3320747
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, H04L12/413
[2018/32]
Former International [2018/20]H04W74/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG EINER UPLINK-KONFLIKT-FENSTERGRÖSSE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2018/20]
English:METHODS AND DEVICES FOR UPDATING AN UPLINK CONTENTION WINDOW SIZE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2018/20]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS DE MISE À JOUR D'UNE TAILLE DE FENÊTRE DE CONTENTION DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2018/20]
Entry into regional phase09.02.2018National basic fee paid 
09.02.2018Search fee paid 
09.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/20]
09.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.09.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/41]
Documents cited:Search[X]  - ERICSSON [HUAWEI HISILICON], "WF on CW adjustment for UL LBT based on Cat. 4", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160530), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165713, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160530), XP051111899 [X] 1-4 * section 2.3; pages 3, 4 *
 [XI]  - ERICSSON, "On UL Channel Access Procedures", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165157, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160514), XP051089829 [X] 1 * slides 2, 3 * [I] 2-4
International search[A]US2014112153  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN105338651  (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOM TECHNOLOGY SHENZ) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HUAWEI, HISILICON, "Contention window size adjustment for UL category 4 LBT for eLAA", 3GPP TSG RAN WGI Meeting #85, R1-164073, (20160527), XP051096611 [X] 1-23 * , page 1, line 25-page 2, line 17, page 3, lines 1-3, figure 1 *