Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469933

EP3469933 - DISPOSABLE CIGARETTE CARTRIDGE, ATOMIZER, AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
China Tobacco Hunan Industrial Co., Ltd.
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha, Hunan 410007 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Jianfu
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
02 / ZHONG, Kejun
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
03 / GUO, Xiaoyi
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
04 / HUANG, Wei
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
05 / DAI, Yuangang
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
06 / YIN, Xinqiang
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
07 / YI, Jianhua
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
08 / YU, Hong
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
09 / HE, Youlin
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
10 / ZHOU, Yongquan
188 Middle Wanjiali Road 3rd Section
Yuhua District
Changsha Hunan 410007 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17836188.702.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN82734
Priority number, dateCN20161063141004.08.2016         Original published format: CN201610631410
CN201621140740U20.10.2016         Original published format: CN 201621140740 U
CN201621401164U20.12.2016         Original published format: CN 201621401164 U
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018024004
Date:08.02.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469933
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A24F47/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINWEGZIGARETTENPATRONE, ZERSTÄUBER UND ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE[2019/16]
English:DISPOSABLE CIGARETTE CARTRIDGE, ATOMIZER, AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE[2019/16]
French:CARTOUCHE DE CIGARETTE JETABLE, ATOMISEUR ET CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
05.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[PX]CN205947126U  (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-26 * , description, paragraphs [0064]-[0083], and figures 1-12 *;
 [PX]CN206043434U  (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0039]-[0064], and figures 1-6 *;
 [PX]CN206025228U  (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0037]-[0051], and figures 1-8 *;
 [PX]CN206043450U  (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0034]-[0045], and figures 1-5 *;
 [PX]CN206119184U  (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0036]-[0048], and figures 1-7 *;
 [PX]CN206119185U  (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-9, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0035]-[0047], and figures 1-7 *;
 [X]CN104770900  (SHANGHAI RUYUN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-7, 16-18, 23-26 * , description, paragraphs [0008]-[0014], and figures 1-4 *;
 [X]CN204861187U  (WANG SHENYI) [X] 1-2 * , description, paragraphs [0026]-[0027], and figures 1-3 *;
 [A]CN105559151  (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-35 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN105795526  (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-35 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2015047658  (CYPHERT GILBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * , the whole document *;
 [A]EP2829183  (LIU TUANFANG [CN]) [A] 1-35 * , the whole document *