Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3495163

EP3495163 - TIRE STEEL CORD AND PNEUMATIC TIRE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
15.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / MORI Yuriko
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/24]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/24]
Application number, filing date17836859.327.07.2017
[2019/24]
WO2017JP27336
Priority number, dateJP2016015498305.08.2016         Original published format: JP 2016154983
[2019/24]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018025753
Date:08.02.2018
Language:JA
[2018/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3495163
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C9/00, D07B1/06
[2019/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
TitleGerman:REIFENSTAHLKORD UND LUFTREIFEN MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON[2019/24]
English:TIRE STEEL CORD AND PNEUMATIC TIRE USING SAME[2019/24]
French:CÂBLE D'ACIER POUR PNEU ET PNEU UTILISANT CE CÂBLE[2019/24]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2019Translation filed 
21.02.2019National basic fee paid 
21.02.2019Search fee paid 
21.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
16.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2845749  (HANKOOK TIRE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0042]; figures 2-7; table 1 * [I] 4-6;
 [IAY]US2009260735  (SASABE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,6-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1-10 * [A] 2 [Y] 3-5;
 [YA]EP0501720  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-5 * figures 2,4a,4b,5; tables 1,2 * [A] 1;
 [Y]EP0399795  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5,10 * examples 11 and 12 in table 1b;; figure 4; table 1b *;
 [YA]US2012028044  (ALVAREZ DENIS [FR], et al) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0067]; claim 10 * [A] 1,2;
 [YA]EP0372959  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-5 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 49; figure -; table 1 * [A] 1,2;
 [Y]JPS61206695U  (BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION) [Y] 1-3,10 * example 4 in table 1; page 11; figures 3A-3C; claim 3; table 1 *
International search[X]JPH1181166  (BRIDGESTONE METALPHA CORP) [X] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0001], [0020], [0022], [0029] to [0033]; fig. 6 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH02306801  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-10 * , entire text & US 5311917 A entire text & EP 399795 A1 & KR 10-0134085 B & CA 2016915 A1 *;
 [A]JPH04193605  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-10 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015052192  (HANKOOK TIRE CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text & US 2015/0068655 A1 entire text & EP 2845749 A1 & KR 10-2015-0028459 A & CN 104420378 A *;
 [A]JPH02154086  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-10 * , entire text & US 5213640 A entire text & EP 372959 A1 *;
 [A]JP2000008282  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-10 * , entire text & US 6182433 B1 entire text & EP 969140 A1 *