Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468265

EP3468265 - PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING UE IN LOW POWER CONSUMPTION MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Jin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / AU, Kelvin Kar Kin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Liqing
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / ZHANG, Jinfang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17838470.730.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017CN91288
Priority number, dateCN20161066532411.08.2016         Original published format: CN201610665324
[2019/15]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018028340
Date:15.02.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468265
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W56/00, H04W52/02
[2019/23]
Former International [2019/15]H04W56/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERFOLGUNG VON BENUTZERGERÄTEN IN EINEM MODUS MIT NIEDRIGEM ENERGIEVERBRAUCH[2019/15]
English:PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING UE IN LOW POWER CONSUMPTION MODE[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT POUR SUIVRE UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) DANS UN MODE DE FAIBLE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "UE mobility tracking in "active state" and in "power saving" state", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-164129 UE MOBILITY TRACKING IN ACTIVE STATE AND IN POWER SAVING STATE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANT, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051105446 [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 6 * * page 4, paragraph 5 * [A] 7,13,14 [I] 3-6,10-12
International search[A]CN103313250  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-52 * , description, paragraphs [0097]-[0115], figures 4 and 5. and claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US2005053099  (SPEAR STEPHEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-52 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101646234  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-52 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN102958073  (POTEVIO INST TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-52 * , the whole document *