blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3496538

EP3496538 - BIOCONTROL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.10.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.07.2022  [2022/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lincoln University
PO Box 85084
Lincoln
7647 Canterbury / NZ
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / HAMPTON, John Graham
275 Knowles Street
St. Albans
8052 Christchurch / NZ
02 / VAN ZIJLL DE JONG, Eline
7 James Street
7608 Lincoln / NZ
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/25]Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date17838887.203.08.2017
[2019/25]
WO2017IB54742
Priority number, dateNZ2015016723112.08.2016         Original published format: NZ 16723115
[2019/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018029579
Date:15.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3496538
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU15.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2020
ClassificationIPC:A01N63/02, A01P1/00
[2020/05]
CPC:
A01N25/00 (EP,US); A01N25/12 (US); A01N63/20 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2019/25]A01N63/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
TitleGerman:BIOLOGISCHE SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/25]
English:BIOCONTROL COMPOSITIONS[2019/25]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE LUTTE BIOLOGIQUE[2019/25]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase24.12.2018National basic fee paid 
24.12.2018Search fee paid 
24.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
24.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/25]
29.07.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/30]
23.03.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2022/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
05.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.202105   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5888501  (BACKMAN PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-21 ** example 9 *;
 [A]  - JAFRA S ET AL, "Potential of bulb-associated bacteria for biocontrol of hyacinth soft rot caused by Dickeya zeae", vol. 106, no. 1, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2672.2008.04000.X, ISSN 1364-5072, (20090101), pages 268 - 277, JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1111/j.1365-2672.2008.04000.x/abstract, (20081201), XP002671554 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 274; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-2672.2008.04000.X
 [A]  - Mazen A Ateyyat ET AL, "Culturable Whitefly Associated Bacteria and Their Potential as Biological Control Agents", JJBS Jordan Journal of Biological Sciences Jordan Journal of Biological Sciences. All rights reserved, (20090930), URL: http://jjbs.hu.edu.jo/files/v2n3/6.pdf, (20191205), XP055650081 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 140, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  - FRANK RASCHE ET AL, "Structural characteristics and plant-beneficial effects of bacteria colonizing the shoots of field grown conventional and genetically modified T4-lysozyme producing potatoes", PLANT AND SOIL ; AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON PLANT-SOIL RELATIONSHIPS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20061031), vol. 289, no. 1-2, doi:10.1007/S11104-006-9103-6, ISSN 1573-5036, pages 123 - 140, XP019453475 [A] 1-15 * page 129, line 24; table 1 * * page 128, column r, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 131, column l, paragraph 2 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11104-006-9103-6
 [A]  - KANG YIJUN ET AL, "A plant growth-promoting rhizobacteria (PGPR) mixture does not display synergistic effects, likely by biofilm but not growth inhibition", MICROBIOLOGY, CONSULTANTS BUREAU, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 83, no. 5, doi:10.1134/S0026261714050166, ISSN 0026-2617, (20140925), pages 666 - 673, (20140925), XP035397685 [A] 1-15 * page 668 - page 669; tables 1-2 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S0026261714050166
 [A]  - KYE MAN CHO ET AL, "Endophytic Bacterial Communities in Ginseng and their Antifungal Activity Against Pathogens", MICROBIAL ECOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20070511), vol. 54, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S00248-007-9208-3, ISSN 1432-184X, pages 341 - 351, XP019538618 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 344, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 344; example GS04; table 1 * * page 345; figure 1B * * page 346, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 347; example GS04; table 2 * * page 348; example GS04; table 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00248-007-9208-3
International search[X]  - ATEYYAT MA et al., "Culturable Whitefly Associated Bacteria and Their Potential as Biological Control Agents", Jordan Journal of Biological Sciences, (20090000), vol. 2, pages 139 - 144, XP019513445 [X] 1, 7-9, 12-13, 15-25, 27-38 & 40 * abstract, pages 140 & 141 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00248-006-9085-1
 [X]  - JAFRA S et al., "Potential of bulb-associated bacteria for biocontrol of hyacinth soft rot caused by Dickeya zeae", Journal of Applied Microbiology, (20090000), vol. 106, pages 268 - 277, XP002671554 [X] 1, 7, 9, 12-25, 27-38 & 40 * & GenBank Accession Number EF693789, 15 January 2009 Sequence has 92.1% identity over 766 nucleotides with SEQ ID NOs: 1, 5, 9 & 13 abstract, pages 269, 272 & 274 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-2672.2008.04000.X
 [A]  - LEE DH et al., "Microbiota on Spoiled Vegetables and Their Characterization", Journal of Food Protection, (20130000), vol. 76, pages 1350 - 1358, XP055463927 [A] 0 * Table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4315/0362-028X.JFP-12-439
 [A]  - SHEN M et al., "Effect of Plant Growth-promoting Rhizobacteria (PGPRs) on plant growth, yield, and quality of tomato (Lycopersicon esculentum Mill.) under simulated seawater irrigation", J Gen Appl Microbiol, (20120000), vol. 58, pages 253 - 262, XP055463928 [A] 0 * abstract *
 [A]  - KWON, S-W et al., "Phylogenetic Analysis of Erwinia Species Based on 16S rRNA Gene Sequences", International Journal of Systematic Bateriology, (19970000), vol. 47, pages 1061 - 1067, XP055463535 [A] 0 * abstract *
 [PX]  - GORYLUK-SALMONOWICZ A. et al., "Endophytic Detection in Selected European Herbal Plants", Polish Journal of Microbiology, (20160900), vol. 65, pages 369 - 375, XP055463537 [PX] 1, 7-9, 12-13, 15-25, 27-38 & 40 * & GenBank Accession number KJ130483, 18 March 2014 Sequence shares 100% identity over 822 nucleotides with SEQ ID NOs: 1, 5, 9 & 13 Abstract, tables II & III, pages 2 & 3. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5604/17331331.1215617
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.