Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471314

EP3471314 - METHOD FOR REPORTING CHANNEL STATE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hyunho
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / YI, Yunjung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / HWANG, Daesung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17839732.904.08.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR08433
Priority number, dateUS201662373982P11.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662373982 P
US201662398528P23.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662398528 P
US201762520547P15.06.2017         Original published format: US 201762520547 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018030714
Date:15.02.2018
Language:KO
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471314
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04L5/16, H04L1/00, H04W24/08
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MELDUNG DES KANALSTATUS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR REPORTING CHANNEL STATE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND DEVICE THEREFOR[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR RAPPORTER UN ÉTAT DE CANAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2015160198  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraph [63]; claim 1; and figure 7. *;
 [A]EP2677671  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0119]-[0126]; and figures 3-5B. *;
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "Hybrid CSI Reporting with One and Two CSI Processes", Rl-165098, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#85, (20160514), XP051096266 [A] 1-16 * See section 2. *
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on CSI Reporting Enhancements for Hybrid CSI-RS", R1-164526, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #85, (20160514), XP051096406 [A] 1-16 * See sections 2-4. *
 [A]  - X INWEI, "Discussion on CSI Reporting for Hybrid CSI-RS", R1 -164895, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #85, (20160513), XP051090230 [A] 1-16 * See sections 2, 3. *