Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471287

EP3471287 - CHANNEL STATE REPORTING METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2019New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YUM, Kunil
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / KANG, Jiwon
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / KIM, Kijun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
04 / YI, Yunjung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17839822.810.08.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR08667
Priority number, dateUS201662373978P11.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662373978 P
US201662416673P02.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662416673 P
US201762469489P09.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762469489 P
US201762481133P04.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762481133 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018030804
Date:15.02.2018
Language:KO
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471287
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/06, H04B17/24, H04B7/26
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KANALSTATUSMELDUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:CHANNEL STATE REPORTING METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND DEVICE THEREFOR[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION DE RAPPORT D'ÉTAT DE CANAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
13.09.2019Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2013286964  (CHU FENG-SENG [TW]) [Y] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0050]; claim 18; and figures 1, 5-6. *;
 [Y]US2014286184  (KIM EUN SUN [KR], et al) [Y] 2, 9 * See paragraphs [0091], [0211]; and figure 13. *;
 [Y]US2012320816  (KIM HAKSEONG [KR], et al) [Y] 3, 10 * See paragraphs [0090], [0103]; and figure 12. *;
 [Y]WO2016115654  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 6, 13 * See paragraphs [0061]-[0070]; claim 9; and figures 9-11. *
 [Y]  - SCHAICH, FRANK et al., "Preliminary Results for Multi-service Support in Link Solution Adaptation", FANTASTIC-5G, DELIVERABLE D3.1, (20160615), XP055463462 [Y] 1-14 * See pages 33-60, 148-178; and figures 6-76, 6-77. *
 [Y]  - PANASONIC et al., "Discussion on the Multiplexing of Different Numerologies", R1-164985, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting 85, (20160513), XP051096781 [Y] 5, 12 * See pages 1-2; and figure 1. *