Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472000

EP3472000 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING VIDEO DATA TO DETECT AND ELIMINATE FLICKERING LIGHT SOURCES THROUGH DYNAMIC EXPOSURE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gentex Corporation
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland, MI 49464 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HILLDORE, Benjamin B.
600 North Centennial Street
Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17840096.607.08.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US45731
Priority number, dateUS201662372022P08.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662372022 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018031466
Date:15.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472000
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU15.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/235, B60R1/00, B60R11/02
[2019/28]
Former International [2019/17]B60R1/00, B60R11/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON VIDEODATEN ZUR ERKENNUNG UND BESEITIGUNG VON FLIMMERNDEN LICHTQUELLEN DURCH DYNAMISCHE BELICHTUNGSSTEUERUNG[2019/17]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING VIDEO DATA TO DETECT AND ELIMINATE FLICKERING LIGHT SOURCES THROUGH DYNAMIC EXPOSURE CONTROL[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES VIDÉO PERMETTANT LA DÉTECTION ET L'ÉLIMINATION DE SOURCES DE LUMIÈRE SCINTILLANTES PAR LE BIAIS D'UNE COMMANDE D'EXPOSITION DYNAMIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Search fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2391117  (RICOH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * figures 1, 11 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0082] * [I] 2-9,11-15;
 [A]WO2011106578  (GENTEX CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2015098325  (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *;
 [AP]EP3089442  (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [AP] 1,10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2004105027  (KAWAMURA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2016142607  (LEE YEON KYEONG [KR]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2009214795  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1-20 * , abstract, paragraphs [0001], [0008], [0013]-[0017], [0020]-[0023], fig. 1, 2, 4, 6 *;
 [A]US2006054783  (VORONOV GERMAN [IL], et al) [A] 1-20