blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3747754

EP3747754 - CONTROL BAR FOR CONTROLLING A DRONE AS A TRACTION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2020/50]CONTROL BAR FOR CONTROLLING A TRACTION UNIT
[2023/51]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.11.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.05.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2024Change - applicantpublished on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fernandez Fernandez, Bernardo
Calle José María Martínez 1, Bajo
33209 Gijón (Asturias) / ES
For all designated states
Fernandez Fernandez, Pablo
Calle José María Martínez 1, Bajo
33209 Gijón Asturias / ES
For all designated states
Fernandez Fernandez, Pelayo
Calle José María Martínez 1, Bajo
33209 Gijón Asturias / ES
[2024/16]
Former [2020/50]For all designated states
Fernandez Fernandez, Bernardo
Calle José María Martínez 1, Bajo
33209 Gijón (Asturias) / ES
For all designated states
Fernandez Fernandez, Pablo
C/ Arquímedes 129
33211 Gijon / ES
For all designated states
Fernandez Fernandez, Pelayo
C/ Arquímedes 129
33211 Gijon / ES
Inventor(s)01 / FERNANDEZ FERNANDEZ, Bernardo
Calle José Maria Martinez 1, Bajo
33211 Gijón (Asturias) / ES
 [2020/50]
Representative(s)González López-Menchero, Álvaro Luis
Protectia Patentes y Marcas, S.L.
C/ Almagro, 3 2º izda.
28010 Madrid / ES
[2024/06]
Former [2020/50]González López-Menchero, Álvaro Luis
Protectia Patentes y Marcas, S.L.
C/ Arte 21, 2°A
28033 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date17840562.716.11.2017
[2020/50]
WO2017ES70756
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019097094
Date:23.05.2019
Language:ES
[2019/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3747754
Date:09.12.2020
Language:EN
[2020/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3747754
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:B63H8/00
[2022/46]
CPC:
A63C11/10 (EP); B63B34/63 (EP,US); A63C17/267 (EP);
B63B32/00 (EP,US); G05D1/0016 (EP); A63C11/00 (EP);
A63C17/0013 (EP); A63C2203/22 (EP); B63B34/00 (EP,US);
B64U10/13 (EP,US); B64U2101/00 (US); B64U2101/05 (EP);
B64U2201/202 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/50]B63B35/79, B63B35/81, B63B35/73
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/50]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERLEISTE ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ALS ANTRIEBSEINHEIT DROHNE[2023/51]
English:CONTROL BAR FOR CONTROLLING A DRONE AS A TRACTION UNIT[2023/51]
French:PALONNIER POUR COMMANDER UN DRONE EN TANT QU' UNITÉ DE TRACTION[2023/51]
Former [2020/50]STEUERLEISTE ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ANTRIEBSEINHEIT
Former [2020/50]CONTROL BAR FOR CONTROLLING A TRACTION UNIT
Former [2020/50]PALONNIER POUR COMMANDER UNE UNITÉ DE TRACTION
Entry into regional phase04.06.2020Translation filed 
05.06.2020National basic fee paid 
05.06.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2020Examination requested  [2020/50]
05.06.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.10.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.12.2023Fee for grant paid
28.12.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012060738  (SELLS ROBIN [US]) [X] 1,4,8,9,16 * paragraphs [0021] , [ 0022] * * figures 1, 5, 6 * [I] 12;
 [A]US8968043  (MURPHY MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 62 - line 65 * * column 3, line 1 - line 5 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2017205820  (LIU TONG [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0016] , [ 0018] ** figure 11 *;
 [XI]KR101796555B  (CHA YOUNG CHEON [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11,13,14,16 * online translation of; paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0059] * * online translation of; paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0100] * * figures 2, 7 * [I] 15
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.