EP3501305 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE SETTING METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changzhou Jwei Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. Room 401 NO.7 Fengxiang Road Xuejia Town Xinbei District Changzhou, Jiangsu 213125 / CN | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Weihua MIAO NO.7 Fengxiang Road Xinbei District Changzhou Jiangsu 213125 / CN | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Zaboliene, Reda METIDA Law Firm Zaboliene and Partners Business center VERTAS Gyneju 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | Application number, filing date | 17841021.3 | 14.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017CN97395 | Priority number, date | CN201610671757 | 16.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610671757 | [2019/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018033049 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501305 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, H04L29/08 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A24F40/50 (EP,US);
A24F40/65 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04L67/1097 (US);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04L67/303 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM EINSTELLEN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN ZIGARETTE | [2019/26] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE SETTING METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE DE CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2019 | Translation filed | 04.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 17.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN105717812 (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2017208867 (LI YONGHAI [CN], et al) [XP] 1-15* paragraphs [0045] , [0043] , [0077] , [0074] , [0 76]; figures 1,4 * | International search | [A]CN104303524 (SHENZHEN JIESHIBO TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *; | [A]WO2015010787 (ARICUM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* , entire document *; | [A]CN105125222 (SHENZHEN YUANJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *; | [X]CN105717812 (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO) [X] 1-15 * , description, paragraphs [0022]-[0070], and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN105785864 (CHEN ZHENJIANG) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *; | [PX]CN106037021 (ZHUOERYUE EUROPE HOLDINGS CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * , claims 1-15, description, paragraphs [0067]-[0145], and figures 1-5 * |