Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471462

EP3471462 - METHOD AMD DEVICE FOR BROADCASTING AND RECEIVING SYSTEM INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Hongping
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / DAI, Mingzeng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / ZENG, Qinghai
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17841071.816.08.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN97668
Priority number, dateCN20161068148917.08.2016         Original published format: CN201610681489
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018033099
Date:22.02.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471462
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN22.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/10, H04W48/20, // H04W48/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SYSTEMINFORMATIONEN[2019/16]
English:METHOD AMD DEVICE FOR BROADCASTING AND RECEIVING SYSTEM INFORMATION[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DIFFUSION ET DE RÉCEPTION D'INFORMATIONS SYSTÈME[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2019Translation filed 
14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2015036645  (SHIN SUNG-HYUK H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,14,15 * paragraphs [0132] , [ 368]; figure 1A * [Y] 3-5,7,10,11,13 [I] 6,9,12;
 [YA]EP2695404  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 43] * [A] 1-10,12-15;
 [Y]EP2523516  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-5,10 * paragraphs [0095] , [ 137] *;
 [A]EP2378812  (HTC CORP [TW]) [A] 3-5,10 * paragraph [0028] *;
 [Y]US2013215785  (JUNG SUNG HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0163] *
 [YA]  - CATT, "System information in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-163470 SYSTEM INFORMATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051104969 [Y] 7,13 * page 1 - page 2 * [A] 1-6,8-12,14,15
International search[X]CN102687543  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD) [X] 1-16 * , description, paragraphs [0002] and [0022]-[0029], and figure 1 *;
 [A]CN102474776  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [A] 1-16 * , entire document *;
 [A]CN101686580  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2014010204  (XU JIAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire document *