blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3501535

EP3501535 - PORCINE EPIDEMIC DIARRHEA PREVENTATIVE OR THERAPEUTIC METHOD, VACCINE, AND VACCINE KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.02.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Institute for Biological Science
9-2221-1, Shin-machi
Ome-shi
Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
For all designated states
Nisseiken Co., Ltd.
9-2221-1 Shin-machi
Ome-shi
Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
[2023/41]
Former [2019/26]For all designated states
Nippon Institute for Biological Science
2221-1, Shin-machi 9-chome
Oume-shi
Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
For all designated states
Nisseiken Co., Ltd.
9-2221-1 Shin-machi
Ome-shi
Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SATO, Tetsuo
c/o NIPPON INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL SCIENCE
9-2221-1 Shin-machi
Ome-shi Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
02 / OROKU, Kazuki
c/o NIPPON INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL SCIENCE
9-2221-1 Shin-machi
Ome-shi Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
03 / OHSHIMA, Yoshiyuki
c/o NIPPON INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL SCIENCE
9-2221-1 Shin-machi
Ome-shi Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
04 / FURUYA, Yoshiaki
c/o NIPPON INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL SCIENCE
9-2221-1 Shin-machi
Ome-shi Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
05 / TSUTSUMI, Nobuyuki
c/o NIPPON INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL SCIENCE
9-2221-1 Shin-machi
Ome-shi Tokyo 198-0024 / JP
 [2019/26]
Representative(s)Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Prinzregentenstraße 22
80538 München / DE
[2019/26]
Application number, filing date17841334.024.07.2017
[2019/26]
WO2017JP26692
Priority number, dateJP2016015979717.08.2016         Original published format: JP 2016159797
[2019/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018034106
Date:22.02.2018
Language:JA
[2018/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3501535
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3501535
Date:20.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/225, A61K39/39, A61P31/12, A61K39/12, A61K39/215, A61P31/14
[2020/19]
CPC:
A61K39/12 (EP); A61K39/225 (KR,US); A61K39/215 (EP);
A61K39/39 (EP,KR,US); A61K9/0019 (US); A61K9/0043 (US);
A61P31/12 (US); A61P31/14 (EP,KR); A61K2039/5252 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,US); A61K2039/54 (EP,KR,US); A61K2039/542 (KR);
A61K2039/543 (KR); A61K2039/545 (EP,US); A61K2039/552 (US);
A61K2039/555 (EP,US); A61K2039/55566 (EP,KR); C12N2770/20034 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/26]A61K39/225, A61K39/39, A61P31/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROPHYLAKTISCHES ODER THERAPEUTISCHES VERFAHREN FÜR EPIDEMISCHE SCHWEINEDIARRHÖ, IMPFSTOFF UND IMPFSTOFF-KIT[2019/26]
English:PORCINE EPIDEMIC DIARRHEA PREVENTATIVE OR THERAPEUTIC METHOD, VACCINE, AND VACCINE KIT[2019/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ PRÉVENTIF OU THÉRAPEUTIQUE POUR LA DIARRHÉE ÉPIDÉMIQUE PORCINE, VACCIN ET KIT DE VACCIN[2019/26]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2019Translation filed 
25.02.2019National basic fee paid 
25.02.2019Search fee paid 
25.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/26]
27.10.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2023Fee for grant paid
09.08.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.09.2023
CZ20.09.2023
EE20.09.2023
FI20.09.2023
HR20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
LV20.09.2023
PL20.09.2023
RO20.09.2023
RS20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
SK20.09.2023
SM20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
IS20.01.2024
PT22.01.2024
[2024/25]
Former [2024/23]AT20.09.2023
CZ20.09.2023
EE20.09.2023
FI20.09.2023
HR20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
LV20.09.2023
RO20.09.2023
RS20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
SK20.09.2023
SM20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
IS20.01.2024
PT22.01.2024
Former [2024/20]FI20.09.2023
HR20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
LV20.09.2023
RS20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
SM20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
IS20.01.2024
Former [2024/10]FI20.09.2023
HR20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
LV20.09.2023
RS20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
Former [2024/09]FI20.09.2023
LT20.09.2023
SE20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
Former [2024/08]LT20.09.2023
NO20.12.2023
GR21.12.2023
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - S. PAUDEL ET AL, "Evaluation of antibody response of killed and live vaccines against porcine epidemic diarrhea virus in a field study", VETERINARY QUARTERLY., NL, (20141002), vol. 34, no. 4, doi:10.1080/01652176.2014.973999, ISSN 0165-2176, pages 194 - 200, XP055679148 [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [02.1] , [ 2.2]; figures 1-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01652176.2014.973999
 [Y]  - SEUNG I JANG ET AL, "Montanide IMS 1313 N VG PR nanoparticle adjuvant enhances antigen-specific immune responses to profilin following mucosal vaccination against", VETERINARY PARASITOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 182, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.VETPAR.2011.05.019, ISSN 0304-4017, (20110516), pages 163 - 170, (20110524), XP028103651 [Y] 1-8 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetpar.2011.05.019
 [T]  - TETSUO SATO ET AL, "Efficacy of genogroup 1 based porcine epidemic diarrhea live vaccine against genogroup 2 field strain in Japan", VIROLOGY JOURNAL, (20180202), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s12985-018-0940-8, XP055679335

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12985-018-0940-8
International search[A]JPH10218788  (NAT FEDERATION AGRIC COOP ASS) [A] 1-8 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]CN104667269  (GUANGDONG HAID ANIMAL HUSBANDRY AND VETERINARY RES INST CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2015153425  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMED [US]) [A] 1-8 * , claims; examples & JP 2017-511328 A & US 2015/0283229 A1 & EP 3125932 A1 & AU 2015241107 A & KR 10-2016-0132494 A & CA 2943816 A & EA 201691993 A & MX 2016012845 A *;
 [A]  - D.S.SONG et al., "Oral efficacy of Vero cell attenuated porcine epidemic diarrhea virus DR13 strain", Research in Veterinary Science, (20070000), vol. 82, doi:10.1016/j.rvsc.2006.03.007, pages 134 - 140, XP005724411 [A] 1-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rvsc.2006.03.007
 [A]  - AKIRA SHIG A, "Buta Ryukosei Geri ga Bunbensha de Hatsu Hassei shita D Nojo deno Taiosaku to sono Koka ni Tsuite", Proceedings of the Japanese Pig Veterinary Society, (20160201), no. 67, pages 18 - 20, XP009518289 [A] 1-8
 [A]  - KULDEEP S.CHATTHA et al., "Strategies for design and application of enteric viral vaccines", Annual review of animal biosciences [Annu. Rev. Anim. Biosci.], (20141006), vol. 3, doi:10.1146/annurev-animal-022114-111038, ISSN 2165-8102, pages 375 - 395, XP009513798 [A] 1-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-animal-022114-111038
 [PA]  - TETSURO SATO, "Current status and future prospects of porcine epidemic diarrhea live vaccine", All about SWINE, (20160900), vol. 49, ISSN 0918-371X, pages 13 - 21, XP009519714 [PA] 1-8
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.