Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472897

EP3472897 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF FOR GRIP RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Dongil
Samsung electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
02 / LIM, Wonsub
Samsung electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
03 / KIM, Daeyoung
Samsung electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
04 / PARK, Sunah
Samsung electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
05 / OH, Seunghyun
Samsung electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17841700.217.08.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017KR08976
Priority number, dateKR2016010482718.08.2016         Original published format: KR 20160104827
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018034518
Date:22.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472897
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H04M1/725, H01Q1/52, H03K17/96, G06F1/16
[2019/28]
Former International [2019/17]H01Q1/24, H04M1/725, H01Q1/52
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GRIFFERKENNUNG DAFÜR[2019/17]
English:ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF FOR GRIP RECOGNITION[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE DE SAISIE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Search fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006139034  (NEVERMANN PETER [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0034]; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US2016036482  (BLACK GREGORY R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0020] *;
 [A]WO2006030360  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013015572  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2015162018  (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2006139034  (NEVERMANN PETER [US]) [X] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0002],[0018]-[0022], claims 21,23 and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]US2016217645  (SEITZ FORREST S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0059]-[0060], claims 1,18 and figure 3. *;
 [A]US2014210686  (ALI SHIROOK M [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0031], claims 1-3 and figure 2. *;
 [A]US2016173172  (GREENE MATTHEW RUSSELL [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0053] and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]JP2014127755  (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-4 and figures 15,17,20. *