Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3505663

EP3505663 - PNEUMATIC TIRE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - extension statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/27]
Inventor(s)01 / SASAKI Yosuke
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/27]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/27]
Application number, filing date17843530.121.08.2017
[2019/27]
WO2017JP29774
Priority number, dateJP2016016297123.08.2016         Original published format: JP 2016162971
[2019/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018038050
Date:01.03.2018
Language:JA
[2018/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3505663
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:D02G3/48, B60C9/00, B60C9/08, B60C9/22, D02G3/26, B60C9/04
[2019/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/27]
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/27]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME[2019/27]
French:PNEUMATIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION[2019/27]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2019Translation filed 
22.02.2019National basic fee paid 
22.02.2019Search fee paid 
22.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/27]
17.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2015105104  (ASAHI KASEI FIBERS CORP [JP]) [I] 1-6 * claims 1-26 *;
 [P]EP3093379  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0055] , [0061] , [0062] , [0082] , [0084] - [0089] - [0184]; claims 1-26 *
International search[A]JP2016068822  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-6 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0022], [0023], [0030] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2016060341  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-6 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0021], [0022], [0025] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2016041571  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-6 * , claims 1, 5; paragraphs [0020], [0021] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012171553  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-6 * , claims 1, 2; paragraphs [0018], [0023] (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2008099118  (AKAHANE HIDENOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , claim 1 & EP 1867495 A1 & CN 101111396 A *;
 [PA]JP2016203777  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [PA] 1-6 * , claims 1 to 3; paragraphs [0023], [0024], [0026], [0033], [0034] (Family: none) *
by applicantWO2006078013
 JPS4811335B