Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3503764

EP3503764 - LASER MODULE SERVICE SHELF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NLIGHT, Inc.
5408 NE 88th Street, Building E
Vancouver, WA 98665 / US
[2019/27]
Inventor(s)01 / EMERY, Joseph J.
5408 NE 88th Street, Building E
Vancouver, Washington 98665 / US
02 / STEPHENS, Rodney
5408 NE 88th Street, Building E
Vancouver, Washington 98665 / US
03 / MARTIN, Eric
5408 NE 88th Street, Building E
Vancouver, Washington 98665 / US
04 / YOUNG, Jeremy
5408 NE 88th Street, Building E
Vancouver, Washington 98665 / US
05 / LIN, Shelly
5408 NE 88th Street, Building E
Vancouver, Washington 98665 / US
 [2019/27]
Representative(s)Raynor, Simon Mark
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/27]Raynor, Simon Mark
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB
Application number, filing date17844511.025.08.2017
[2019/27]
WO2017US48679
Priority number, dateUS201662380264P26.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662380264 P
[2019/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018039598
Date:01.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3503764
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A47B57/04, A47B57/00, A47B57/42, A47B57/48, A47B96/02, A47B96/06
[2019/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/27]
TitleGerman:LASERMODUL-SERVICEREGAL[2019/27]
English:LASER MODULE SERVICE SHELF[2019/27]
French:TABLETTE DE SERVICE POUR MODULE LASER[2019/27]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2019National basic fee paid 
19.03.2019Search fee paid 
19.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5771325  (NEUBERGER WOLFGANG [MY]) [Y] 1-4, 12-14, 16, 17, 19 * entire document *;
 [Y]US6158599  (LAZARUS ABRAHAM M [IL]) [Y] 1-4, 12-14, 16, 17, 19 * entire document *;
 [Y]US7200317  (REAGAN RANDY [US], et al) [Y] 12-14 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2012080391  (NAKAMURA OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 16, 17, 19 * entire document *;
 [A]US8488245  (CHANN BIEN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *;
 [A]US2006157436  (IWAMOTO MISA [JP]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *