Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3507377

EP3507377 - ALLOSTERIC SPLIT TREHALASE BIOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
08.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Creative Protein Solutions Inc
75 Royal Ridge Rise NW
Calgary, Alberta T3G 5M1 / CA
[2019/28]
Inventor(s)01 / DE BUCK, Jeroen
c/o UTI Limited Partnership
3553-31st Street NW
Calgary, Alberta T2L 2K7 / CA
 [2019/28]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/28]
Application number, filing date17844754.601.09.2017
[2019/28]
WO2017CA51033
Priority number, dateUS201662383107P02.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662383107 P
[2019/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018039802
Date:08.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3507377
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA08.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/00, C12M1/34, C12Q1/26, C12Q1/34, G01N21/75, G01N27/403, G01N33/53
[2019/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/28]
TitleGerman:ALLOSTERISCHER GETEILTER TREHALASE-BIOSENSOR[2019/28]
English:ALLOSTERIC SPLIT TREHALASE BIOSENSOR[2019/28]
French:BIOCAPTEUR DE TRÉHALASE SCINDÉE ALLOSTÉRIQUE[2019/28]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2019National basic fee paid 
12.03.2019Search fee paid 
12.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2008248463  (WEISS SHIMON [US], et al) [X] 1, 2 *the entire document*;
 [X]  - GUO, Z. et al., "Engineered PQQ-Glucose Dehydrogenase as a Universal Biosensor Platform", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20160817), vol. 138, no. 32, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 10108 - 10111, XP055437758 [X] 1, 2, 13-15, 21, 25, 26 * . *the entire document*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jacs.6b06342
 [X]  - STAINS, C.I. et al., "A General Approach for Receptor and Antibody-Targeted Detection of Native Proteins utilizing Split-Luciferase Reassembly", ACS Chem. Biol., (20101015), vol. 5, no. 10, ISSN 1554-8929, pages 943 - 952, XP055120496 [X] 1, 2 * . *the entire document*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cb100143m
 [X]  - DE BUCK, J., "Turning the glucose sensor into a versatile point-of-care platform for the detection of a wide range of biological analytes", 6th International Conference and Exhibition on Biosensors & Bioelectronics, (20160922), URL: https://www.omicsonline.org/speaker/jeroen-de-buck-associate-professor-university-of-calgary-canada, (20170811), XP055469830 [X] 1-31 *the entire document*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4172/2155-6210.C1.030