Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474145

EP3474145 - STORAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNAL IN STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SHEN, Mingyong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LIU, Wenxing
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17845395.729.08.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN99448
Priority number, dateCN20161078553731.08.2016         Original published format: CN201610785537
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018041093
Date:08.03.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474145
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/3234, G06F3/06, G06F13/42
[2019/26]
Former International [2019/17]G06F12/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPEICHERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM SPEICHERSYSTEM[2019/17]
English:STORAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SIGNAL IN STORAGE SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'UN SIGNAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019Translation filed 
17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Search fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1909164  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0029] , [0033] , [0145] , [0123] * * figures 1,4,11,18,21 * [I] 2-4;
 [A]US8756445  (WALSH ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 19, line 11 - line 27 * * figure 12 *;
 [A]EP2988190  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2015363109  (FRICK GUY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0056] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]JP2001339853  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 2 *
International search[A]CN101403945  (CHENGDU HUAWEI SYMANTEC TECH [CN]) [A] 1-7 * , entire document *;
 [A]CN201867678U  (MICRO STAR INT CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire document *