blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3509105

EP3509105 - LIGHT-RECEIVING ELEMENT, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT-RECEIVING ELEMENT, IMAGING ELEMENT, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.10.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.07.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.08.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation
4-14-1, Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
[2019/28]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIGIWA, Jun
c/o Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation
4-14-1 Asahicho
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
 [2024/13]
Former [2019/28]01 / YOSHIGIWA, Jun
c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
4-14-1 Asahicho
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[2019/28]
Application number, filing date17845896.407.07.2017
[2019/28]
WO2017JP24983
Priority number, dateJP2016017195902.09.2016         Original published format: JP 2016171959
[2019/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018042886
Date:08.03.2018
Language:JA
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3509105
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3509105
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2019
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/146, H01L31/0264, H01L31/0304, H04N25/70
[2023/29]
CPC:
H01L27/1463 (EP,US); H01L27/146 (KR); H01L27/14623 (EP,US);
H01L27/14621 (EP,US); H01L27/14627 (EP,US); H01L27/1464 (EP,US);
H01L27/14645 (US); H01L27/14685 (US); H01L27/14689 (US);
H01L27/14694 (EP,US); H01L31/0264 (KR); H04N25/70 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/03044 (EP,US); H01L31/03046 (US); Y02P70/50 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/52]H01L27/146, H01L31/0264, H04N5/369, H01L31/0304
Former IPC [2019/28]H01L27/146, H01L31/0264, H04N5/369
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTEMPFANGENDES ELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES LICHTEMPFANGENDEN ELEMENTS, BILDGEBUNGSELEMENT UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2019/28]
English:LIGHT-RECEIVING ELEMENT, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT-RECEIVING ELEMENT, IMAGING ELEMENT, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE[2019/28]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE RÉCEPTION DE LUMIÈRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENT DE RÉCEPTION DE LUMIÈRE, ÉLÉMENT D'IMAGERIE, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE[2019/28]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2019Translation filed 
27.03.2019National basic fee paid 
27.03.2019Search fee paid 
27.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/28]
27.05.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.08.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2023Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2024Fee for grant paid
15.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2012033119  (SHINOHARA TAKEKAZU [JP]) [Y] 1-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0058] - [0089] - [0 97] - [0104] * * figures 2, 10A, 10B *;
 [A]US2012217602  (ENOMOTO TAKAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0022] - [0 87] - [0099] - [ 111] - [0135] ** figures 3, 23 *;
 [XA]JP2012191135  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-4,13 * paragraphs [0016] - [0017] - [0 20] - [0023] - [0 26] - [0029] * * figures 1, 4-8 * [A] 5-10,14,15;
 [A]US2015155327  (KUBOI NOBUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0050] - [0 61] - [0069] - [0 76] - [0079] * * figures 1, 4, 6 *;
 [Y]US2016064430  (LEE YUN-KI [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10,13-15 * paragraph [0066] *
International search[XYA]JP2012191135  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-4, 10-13 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0037]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [Y] 5-9 [A] 14-16;
 [A]JP2013093385  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 14-16 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0039]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2013191869  (SONY CORP) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0061]; fig. 13 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014127514  (SONY CORP) [A] 16* , paragraphs [0026] to [0038]; fig. 2 to 8 & US 2014/0175521 A1 paragraphs [0049] to [0061]; fig. 2 to 8 & CN 103904090 A *;
 [Y]JP2015037154  (SONY CORP) [Y] 5-9 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0050]; fig. 7 & US 2015/0048473 A1 paragraphs [0024] to [0060]; fig. 7 & CN 104377215 A *;
 [Y]JP2015070070  (SONY CORP) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0054]; fig. 4 & US 2015/0091121 A1 paragraphs [0028] to [0065]; fig. 4 & CN 104517981 A & KR 10-2015-0035397 A & TW 201513324 A *
by applicantJP2014127499
 JP2016171959
    - Appl. Phys. Lett., (19840000), vol. 44, page 750
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.