blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3509041

EP3509041 - PAPER SHEET SENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2023
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.04.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.03.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.12.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glory Ltd.
3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-8567 / JP
[2019/28]
Inventor(s)01 / MIMURA, Tomohiro
c/o GLORY Ltd.
3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome
Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP
02 / AKAGI, Masayuki
c/o GLORY Ltd.
3-1 Shimoteno 1-chome
Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP
 [2019/28]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[2019/28]
Application number, filing date17845899.810.07.2017
[2019/28]
WO2017JP25116
Priority number, dateJP2016016973831.08.2016         Original published format: JP 2016169738
[2019/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018042889
Date:08.03.2018
Language:JA
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3509041
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3509041
Date:18.05.2022
Language:EN
[2022/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2020
ClassificationIPC:G07D9/00, G01N21/33, G01N21/59, G07D7/12, G07D7/121
[2019/28]
CPC:
G07D7/12 (EP); G07D7/121 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PAPIERBLATTERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/28]
English:PAPER SHEET SENSING DEVICE[2019/28]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE FEUILLE DE PAPIER[2019/28]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2019Translation filed 
27.03.2019National basic fee paid 
27.03.2019Search fee paid 
27.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/28]
11.09.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
03.12.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2022Fee for grant paid
31.03.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.04.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.02.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.07.2017
CY11.05.2022
AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
IT18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE10.07.2022
LU10.07.2022
FR18.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
DE01.02.2023
[2024/20]
Former [2024/18]HU10.07.2017
AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
IT18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE10.07.2022
LU10.07.2022
FR18.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
DE01.02.2023
Former [2024/11]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
IT18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE10.07.2022
LU10.07.2022
FR18.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
DE01.02.2023
Former [2023/33]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
IE10.07.2022
LU10.07.2022
FR18.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
DE01.02.2023
Former [2023/25]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
LU10.07.2022
FR18.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
DE01.02.2023
Former [2023/23]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
LU10.07.2022
FR18.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
DE01.02.2023
Former [2023/22]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
LU10.07.2022
FR18.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/21]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
LU10.07.2022
CH31.07.2022
LI31.07.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/17]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/11]AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/09]AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/07]AT18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/51]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/50]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/49]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/48]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
NO18.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/47]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
NO18.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5640463  (CSULITS FRANK M [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 49 * [I] 5-8,10-15;
 [A]JPH1040436  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] ** paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020] *;
 [XI]WO9948042  (CUMMINS ALLISON CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * page 22, lines 13-20 * * page 42, lines 1-24 * * page 45, line 5 - page 50, line 10 * * page 51, lines 12-26 * [I] 5-8,10-15;
 [XI]US2001035603  (GRAVES BRADFORD T [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0082] * * figures 1,2,11-14,23 * [I] 5-8,10-15;
 [A]JP2014199242  (VIENEX CORP) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] *
International search[YA]JPH0666680  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [Y] 15, 17 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0024]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [A] 1-14, 16;
 [YA]JPH1040436  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [Y] 17 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0021]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [A] 1-16;
 [A]JPH10142163  (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND) [A] 1-17* , paragraphs [0001] to [0020]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [YA]JP2000285278  (FUJITSU KIDEN) [Y] 14-15, 17 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0050]; fig. 1 to 9 (Family: none) * [A] 1-13, 16;
 [YA]JP2001357429  (GLORY KOGYO KK) [Y] 1, 4-15, 17 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0028]; fig. 1 to 19 (Family: none) * [A] 2-3, 16;
 [YA]JP2009140389  (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 1, 4-15, 17 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0062]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * [A] 2-3, 16;
 [YA]JP2014029301  (NIDEC COPAL CORP) [Y] 9-15, 17 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0050]; fig. 1 to 16 (Family: none) * [A] 1-8, 16;
 [YA]JP2014199242  (VIENEX CORP) [Y] 4-15, 17 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0059]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * [A] 1-3, 16;
 [YA]JP2016141065  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD, et al) [Y] 10-15, 17 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0086]; fig. 1 to 16 (Family: none * [A] 1-9, 16
ExaminationUS2002015145
 US2003030785
by applicantJPS649879B
 JP2576054Y
 JP4723003B
 JP2015095023
 JP2015138437
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.