Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469684

EP3469684 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING WIRELESS CHARGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Yu Su
1403-901
60 Heungdeok 3-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16950 / KR
02 / KIM, Ji Young
104, 84-15 Maetan-ro 140beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16544 / KR
03 / PARK, Se Ho
103-1402
251 Beopjo-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16941 / KR
04 / JUNG, Woo Jin
4502-1501
11 Gwanggyomaeul-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16944 / KR
05 / PARK, Young Joon
109-503
21-11 Gugal-ro 28beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16973 / KR
06 / PARK, Jung Su
118-2801
363 Hyowon-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16543 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17846980.529.08.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR09454
Priority number, dateKR2016011163931.08.2016         Original published format: KR 20160111639
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018044055
Date:08.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469684
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/02, H02J50/80, H02J7/00, G01C19/00, G01P15/00, H02J7/04, H02J9/00, H02J50/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON DRAHTLOSEM LADEN[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING WIRELESS CHARGING[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE CHARGE SANS FIL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
24.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2012293119  (PARK SUNG-BUM [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10,13-15 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,5,11,12;
 [XY]US2014312836  (LUNDGREN MIKA-PETTERI [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6-15 * figure 3 * [Y] 4,5;
 [A]US2014306657  (LUNDGREN MIKA-PETTERI [FI], et al) [A] 1,10 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]US2013119929  (PARTOVI AFSHIN [US]) [Y] 4,5,11,12 * paragraphs [0076] , [0078] , [0101] *;
 [A]US2016105841  (KANG HYEON-JIN [KR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3-10 *
International search[XY]US2015188359  (PARK SUNG-BUM [KR], et al) [X] 1-3, 7-9 * See paragraphs 22-33, 37-39, 44, 55; claims 1, 4; and figures 1-2. * [Y] 4-6, 10-15;
 [Y]US2013119929  (PARTOVI AFSHIN [US]) [Y] 4-6, 10-15 * See paragraphs 101-102, 232; and figure 10. *;
 [A]US2014361741  (VON NOVAK III WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]US2011156636  (KIM BONG-YOUNG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]WO2012165688  (SIM SOON SUB [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See the whole document. *