blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3511341

EP3511341 - DEGLYCOSYLATED ANTIBODY SPECIFICALLY BINDING TO CLEC14A AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.08.2022  [2022/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WOORI TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
4F., Woori Technologies Bldg.
9, World Cup buk-ro 56-gil, Mapo-gu
Seoul
03923 / KR
[2019/29]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sukmook
102-1206 (Seongnae-dong
Seong An village Cheonggu Apt.)
114-1 Pungseong-ro
Gangdong-gu
Seoul 05393 / KR
02 / KIM, Taek-Keun
103-1401 (Yoseon-dong
Hansin Hyuplus Apt.)
34 Seobudaeseong-ro
Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 24271 / KR
03 / KIM, Mi Ra
502 Hongcheon-ro
Hongcheon-eup
Hongcheon-gun Gangwon-do 25125 / KR
04 / JANG, Ji Hye
No. 305 (Onui-dong)
21-1 Chunju-ro 92beon-gil
Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 24438 / KR
 [2019/29]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/29]Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date17849118.908.09.2017
[2019/29]
WO2017KR09851
Priority number, dateKR2016011557708.09.2016         Original published format: KR 20160115577
[2019/29]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018048234
Date:15.03.2018
Language:KO
[2018/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3511341
Date:17.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/18, A61K39/395, A61K39/00
[2019/29]
CPC:
C07K16/2851 (EP,US); C07K16/18 (KR,US); A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (US); A61K39/39533 (KR); A61P35/00 (US);
A61K2039/505 (KR,US); C07K2317/14 (EP); C07K2317/40 (KR,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP); C07K2317/56 (EP); C07K2317/565 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/567 (KR); C07K2317/622 (EP); C07K2317/73 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP); C07K2317/92 (EP); C07K2317/94 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/29]
TitleGerman:ENTGLYKOSILIERTER ANTIKÖRPER MIT SPEZIFISCHER BINDUNG AN CLEC14A UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2019/29]
English:DEGLYCOSYLATED ANTIBODY SPECIFICALLY BINDING TO CLEC14A AND USES THEREOF[2019/29]
French:ANTICORPS DÉGLYCOSYLÉ SE LIANT SPÉCIFIQUEMENT À CLEC14A ET SES UTILISATIONS[2019/29]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2019Translation filed 
31.01.2019National basic fee paid 
31.01.2019Search fee paid 
31.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/29]
29.06.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/35]
25.04.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2022/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.202105   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO2013187556  (SCRIPPS KOREA ANTIBODY INST [KR]) [YD] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - KIRSTY D. RATANJI ET AL, "Immunogenicity of therapeutic proteins: Influence of aggregation", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOTOXICOLOGY, US, (20130806), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.3109/1547691X.2013.821564, ISSN 1547-691X, pages 99 - 109, XP055576699 [Y] 1-12 * See § methods to reduce aggregation *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/1547691X.2013.821564
International search[A]US2007059748  (AFAR DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See the entire document. *;
 [X]WO2011027132  (CANCER REC TECH LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7, 10-12 * See abstract; claims 1-3. *;
 [XA]KR20150023665  (SCRIPPS KOREA ANTIBODY INST [KR]) [X] 1-7, 10-12 * See paragraph [0225]; table 6; claims I, 31-33. * [A] 8-9;
 [X]  - KI, M. K. et al., "Human Antibodies Targeting the C-type Lectin-like Domain of the Tumor Endothelial Cell Marker Clec 14a Regulate Angiogenic Properties in Vitro", Oncogene, (20130506), vol. 32, no. 48, pages 5449 - 5457, XP055177751 [X] 1-7, 10-12 * See abstract. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2013.156
 [A]  - MCCONNELL, AUDREY D. et al., "A General Approach to Antibody Thermostabilization", mAbs, (20140903), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 1274 - 1282, XP055414613 [A] 1-12 * See the entire document. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.29680
by applicantWO2013187556
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.