EP3509593 - ANTIMICROBIAL POLYMER FOR USE IN OPHTHALMIC IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KeraMed, Inc. 1535 East 17th Street, Suite 106 Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | [2022/46] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Keramed, Inc. 16610 Aston Street Irvine, California 92606 / US | ||
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Keramed, Inc. 4122 East Chapman Avenue 2nd Floor, Suite 26 Orange, California 95129 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIUEY, Yichieh 16610 Aston Street Irvine, CA 92606 / US | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/45] |
Former [2019/29] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17849503.2 | 07.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017US50401 | Priority number, date | US201615260251 | 08.09.2016 Original published format: US201615260251 | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018048982 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509593 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3509593 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3509593 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/50, A61F2/14, A61L27/52, A61L27/54, A61L27/16, A61L27/18, A61L27/24 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/0051 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/142 (KR);
A61F9/00781 (KR);
A61L27/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/26 (KR,US);
A61L27/3641 (US);
A61L27/3687 (US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,KR);
C08F212/10 (KR);
C08F220/60 (KR);
C08G18/83 (US);
C08L25/12 (KR);
C08L33/00 (US);
C08L33/08 (KR);
C08L33/12 (KR);
C08L33/26 (KR);
A61F2250/0067 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
A61L27/18, C08L83/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/29] | A61K31/4425, A61K31/78, A61P31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLES POLYMERE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI OPHTHALMISCHEN IMPLANTATEN | [2019/29] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL POLYMER FOR USE IN OPHTHALMIC IMPLANTS | [2019/29] | French: | POLYMÈRE ANTIMICROBIEN DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS DES IMPLANTS OPHTALMIQUES | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 31.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | AT | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | [2023/51] |
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9827896 (OPHTHA MED INC [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]US2003064102 (NAKATSUKA KAZUMITSU [JP]) [X] 1-14 * example - *; | [X]US2014022507 (NICOLSON PAUL CLEMENT [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0072] *; | [X] - IMAZATO S. ET AL., "Antibacterial activity of cured dental resin incorporating the antibacterial monomer MDPB and an adhesion-promoting monomer", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, US, (19980315), vol. 39, no. 4, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-4636(19980315)39:4<511::AID-JBM1>3.0.CO;2-M, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 511 - 515, XP055679499 [X] 1-14 * figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4636(19980315)39:4<511::AID-JBM1>3.0.CO;2-M | International search | [Y]US5981615 (MEIJS GORDON FRANCIS [AU], et al) [Y] 4, 14 * ; column 8, lines 14-18; column 10, lines 25-30, 35-40 *; | [XY]US2005249695 (TILLER JOERG C [DE], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-6, 9, 11-13, 15-16, 19 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0029], [0052], [0060], [0125], [0128]-[0129], [0131], [0155], [0176], [0267] * [Y] 4, 14; | [Y]US2008057106 (ERICKSON SIGNE R [US], et al) [Y] 10, 20* ; paragraphs [0171], [0226] *; | [XY]US2016220725 (WHALEN III JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1, 7-8, 11, 17-18 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0056], [0059]-[0060], [0066], [0131], [0139], [0147] * [Y] 10, 20 |