Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536158

EP3536158 - EXTRACTION METHOD AND EXTRACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.02.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tree Field, Inc.
Tokyo Square Garden Bldg 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / KIHARA, Kaishun
c/o TREE FIELD INC.
Tokyo Square Garden Bldg
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
02 / TOGASHI, Kazuki
c/o TREE FIELD INC.
Tokyo Square Garden Bldg
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
03 / TORIZU, Taisuke
c/o TREE FIELD INC.
Tokyo Square Garden Bldg
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
04 / NOAKE, Nobuhiro
c/o TREE FIELD INC.
Tokyo Square Garden Bldg
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
05 / ABE, Kazuhiro
c/o TREE FIELD INC.
Tokyo Square Garden Bldg
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
06 / SAITO, Toshio
c/o TREE FIELD INC.
Tokyo Square Garden Bldg
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Beder, Jens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17849804.407.08.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017JP28618
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019030805
Date:14.02.2019
Language:JA
[2019/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536158
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A23F5/26, A23L2/00
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EXTRAKTIONSVERFAHREN UND EXTRAKTIONSVORRICHTUNG[2019/37]
English:EXTRACTION METHOD AND EXTRACTION DEVICE[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2018Translation filed 
19.03.2018National basic fee paid 
19.03.2018Search fee paid 
19.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2018Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPS5268569  (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [X] 1-5, 7, 8 * , claims; drawings (Family: none) * [Y] 6;
 [Y]JPH09327387  (SANDEN CORP) [Y] 6 * , claims; drawings & US 5878654 A claims; figures & EP 812559 A1 *;
 [Y]JPH0991534  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 6 * , claims; drawings (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPH04354912  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 6 * , examples; drawings & EP 516884 A2 examples; figures & KR 10-1996-0001210 B *
by applicantJPH0581544
 JP2003024703