Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3513015

EP3513015 - HINGING DRYWALL APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
22.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moscovitch, Jerry
86 Truman Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M2L 2L6 / CA
For all designated states
Wilk, Raymond Richard
3420 Grand Forks Road
Mississauga, Ontario L4Y 3M9 / CA
[2019/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/30]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2019/30]
Application number, filing date17849946.314.09.2017
[2019/30]
WO2017CA00204
Priority number, dateUS201662395161P15.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662395161 P
[2019/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018049505
Date:22.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3513015
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA22.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:E04C2/06, E04C2/34
[2019/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/30]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR SCHARNIERTE TROCKENWAND[2019/30]
English:HINGING DRYWALL APPARATUS AND METHOD[2019/30]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CLOISON SÈCHE ARTICULÉE[2019/30]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2019National basic fee paid 
14.03.2019Search fee paid 
14.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/30]
18.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4704837  (MENCHETTI ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 7, 10, 11, 13, 19-26 *the whole document* [Y] 12, 27;
 [XY]US4000594  (KIRK JR JAMES D) [X] 1, 3, 9-11, 14, 15, 17, 19-23, 26, 44 *the whole document* [Y] 12, 27;
 [X]US8236114  (GANGL JOSEF [AT]) [X] 1, 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 10, 11 *the whole document*;
 [X]EP2933397  (REINER SCHMITT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1, 7, 10, 11, 14, 16, 18 *the whole document*;
 [X]DE10241223  (INBAU BAUSYSTEME GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1, 4-8, 10, 11, 14, 16, 18 *the whole document*;
 [X]US2008010907  (MOENCH JOHN P [US]) [X] 39, 40 *the whole document*;
 [Y]DE8128252U  (ADAM, O.) [Y] 12, 27 *the whole document*