blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3515442

EP3515442 - DOSE ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.12.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2022Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.01.2023  [2023/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AbbVie Inc.
1 North Waukegan Road
North Chicago, IL 60064 / US
[2019/31]
Inventor(s)01 / DUTTA, Sandeep
1 Charlestowne Court
Lincolnshire Illinois 60069 / US
02 / KOSLOSKI, Matthew
322 Oak Cir.
Wilmette Illinois 60094 / US
03 / LIU, Wei
1287 Derby Lane
Mundelein Illinois 60060 / US
 [2019/31]
Representative(s)Garner, Stephen, et al
Mathys & Squire The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/31]Garner, Stephen, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Application number, filing date17854006.822.09.2017
[2019/31]
WO2017US52994
Priority number, dateUS201662398724P23.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662398724 P
US201762510936P25.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762510936 P
[2019/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018057919
Date:29.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3515442
Date:31.07.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/4709, A61K31/4184, A61P31/14, C07D403/10
[2019/31]
CPC:
A61K38/13 (EP,US); A61K31/192 (US); A61K31/22 (US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US); A61K31/498 (EP,US); A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/454, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/498, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/13, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/31]
Extension statesBA29.03.2019
ME29.03.2019
Validation statesMA29.03.2019
MD29.03.2019
TitleGerman:DOSISANPASSUNG[2019/31]
English:DOSE ADJUSTMENT[2019/31]
French:RÉGLAGE DE DOSE[2019/31]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2019National basic fee paid 
29.03.2019Search fee paid 
29.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/31]
23.11.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
02.02.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2022Application withdrawn by applicant  [2023/03]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
02.02.2021Request for further processing filed
02.02.2021Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.02.2021Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US2010226886  (SASIELA WILLLIAM J [US]) [Y] 11, 23 * para [0002], [0073], [0075]-[0078] *;
 [Y]US2011020272  (SCHUBERT ULRICH [DE]) [Y] 1-26 * abstract, para [0511] *;
 [A]US2011206680  (VALDES JOAQUIN MARIO [US], et al) [A] 1-26* para [0570], [0571], [0578] *;
 [Y]US2015266977  (HSIEH CHUNG-MING [US], et al) [Y] 7-9, 19-21 * para [0469], [0488], [0494] *;
 [Y]WO2016140615  (MEDIVIR AB [SE]) [Y] 1-26 * pg 22, In 13-22; pg 24, In 6-35; pg 39, In 4-11; pg 54, In 15-pg 55, In 2; pg 55, In 28-pg56, In 2; pg 61, In 4-7 *;
 [A]WO2016141092  (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * entire document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.