Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471473

EP3471473 - PARAMETER DETERMINATION METHOD, BASE STATION AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Ning
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LI, Zhongfeng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / QIN, Yi
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Roth, Sebastian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17854743.621.09.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN102581
Priority number, dateCN20161087250829.09.2016         Original published format: CN201610872508
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018059293
Date:05.04.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471473
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN05.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04W56/00, H04L27/26, H04W76/11
[2019/30]
Former International [2019/16]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PARAMETERBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN, BASISSTATION UND BENUTZERGERÄT[2019/16]
English:PARAMETER DETERMINATION METHOD, BASE STATION AND USER EQUIPMENT[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE PARAMÈTRE, STATION DE BASE ET ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019Translation filed 
11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Search fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2016130175  (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,7-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0034] , [0037] , [0078]; tables 1-3 *
 [X]  - PANASONIC, "Use of multiple numerologies in NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-167439, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051140672 [X] 1-6,8-13,15 * section 2;; tables 1,2 *