Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3537208 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3537208



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 265
14.08.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.08.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
12.08.2019 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
31.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.07.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.07.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
31.07.2019 Description Search / examination 63
31.07.2019 Drawings Search / examination 9
31.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.05.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 2
16.05.2019 Deficiencies in translation of international application Search / examination 2
10.05.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.04.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
30.04.2019 Notification of Decision on Request to Restore Right of Priority Search / examination 1
30.04.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.04.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
16.04.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
08.02.2019 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
23.04.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
23.04.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
23.04.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 53
05.04.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.04.2018 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
05.04.2018 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 29