Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3537208 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201710045498 CN201710048472 CN201710052402 CN201710932889 CN201710935127 CN201710935128 EP17855048



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190075912Global Dossier 01.07.2019A
Priority number Date
CN201710052402 21.01.2017
WO2017CN105194 01.10.2017
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
CN201710045498 21.01.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019531513Global Dossier 31.10.2019A
Priority number Date
CN201710052402 21.01.2017
WO2017CN105194 01.10.2017
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
CN201710045498 21.01.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107910322Global Dossier 13.04.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107886853Global Dossier 06.04.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107884987Global Dossier 06.04.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107093659BGlobal Dossier 01.11.2019B
CN107093659 25.08.2017A
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107092130Global Dossier 25.08.2017A
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107092129Global Dossier 25.08.2017A
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3537208Global Dossier 11.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
CN201710052402 21.01.2017
WO2017CN105194 01.10.2017
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
CN201710045498 21.01.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN206557505U 13.10.2017U
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN206610054U 03.11.2017U
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN207123684U 20.03.2018U
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN207611564U 13.07.2018U
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN207611791U 13.07.2018U
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN207676905U 31.07.2018U
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN208315599U 01.01.2019U
Priority number Date
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2018059598Global Dossier 05.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
CN201710052402 21.01.2017
CN201610878541 30.09.2016
CN201710045498 21.01.2017