Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537208

EP3537208 - LIGHT SOURCE ASSEMBLY, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR LIGHT SOURCE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen LT Optoelectronics Co., Ltd.
Building B15 Hengfeng Industrial City
Xixiang Hezhou Street
Baoan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Lei
Building B15 Hengfeng Industrial City
Xixiang Hezhou Street
Baoan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Zaboliene, Reda
METIDA Law Firm Zaboliene and Partners
Business center VERTAS
Gyneju 16
01109 Vilnius / LT
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17855048.901.10.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017CN105194
Priority number, dateCN20161087854130.09.2016         Original published format: CN201610878541
CN2017105240221.01.2017         Original published format: CN201710052402
CN2017104549821.01.2017         Original published format: CN201710045498
[2019/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018059598
Date:05.04.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537208
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN05.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/13357
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTQUELLENANORDNUNG, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER LICHTQUELLENANORDNUNG[2019/37]
English:LIGHT SOURCE ASSEMBLY, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR LIGHT SOURCE ASSEMBLY[2019/37]
French:ENSEMBLE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR ENSEMBLE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2019Translation filed 
30.04.2019National basic fee paid 
30.04.2019Search fee paid 
30.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/37]
30.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
31.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2019/37]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation
31.07.2019Request for further processing filed
31.07.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.08.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03