Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471294

EP3471294 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 26.02.2020  [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIN, Seokmin
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19
Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / KO, Hyunsoo
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19
Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / KIM, Kijun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19
Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17856777.228.09.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017KR10809
Priority number, dateUS201662401937P30.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662401937 P
US201662417357P04.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662417357 P
US201662418851P08.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662418851 P
US201762454061P03.02.2017         Original published format: US 201762454061 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018062891
Date:05.04.2018
Language:KO
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471294
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SYNCHRONISATIONSSIGNALEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS VERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR METHOD[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'ÉMETTRE ET DE RECEVOIR UN SIGNAL DE SYNCHRONISATION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019Translation filed 
14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YP]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Finalization of the NR-SSS", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1709911, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051299136 [YP] 1-14 * pages 1, 3; figure 1 *
 [Y]  - NEC, "Discussion on numerology multiplexing", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-166637, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051125482 [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 *
 [YP]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Evaluation of NR-SS", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170629), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1711860, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1706/Docs/, (20170629), XP051306050 [YP] 3,12 * table 1 *
 [AP]  - INTEL CORPORATION, "Synchronization Signal Sequence Design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1702180 SS SEQUENCE - CLEAN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051209339 [AP] 1-14 * figure 4 *
International search[YA]KR20130121649  (KT CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-8, 11-16 * See paragraph [0099]; claim 1; and figure 18. * [A] 9-10;
 [Y]KR101502614B  (BROADCOM CORPORATION) [Y] 1-8, 11-16 * See paragraph [0021]; and claim 12. *;
 [Y]KR20090131621  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 2-4, 12-16 * See paragraphs [83], [85], [101]; and claims 1, 4. *;
 [A]KR100881169B  (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH IN STITUTE) [A] 1-16 * See claims 1-5. *;
 [A]WO2013015645  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * See paragraph [0074]; and figure 10. *