blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3519387

EP3519387 - TETRAHYDROPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.06.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.07.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.04.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dong-A ST Co., Ltd.
64 Cheonho-daero
Dongdaemun-gu
Seoul 02587 / KR
[2019/32]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOI, Sun-Ho
102-606
63 Seoun-ro 9-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06732 / KR
02 / IM, Weon-Bin
105-702
121 Jukjeon-ro
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16899 / KR
03 / CHOI, Sung-Hak
524-203
35 Naejeong-ro 165beon-gil
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13597 / KR
04 / CHO, Chong-Hwan
105-703
21-11 Gugal-ro 28beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16973 / KR
05 / MOON, Ho-Sang
424-1702
100 Cheongmyeong-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16709 / KR
06 / PARK, Jung-Sang
109-2304
Daelim Apt.
14 Osan-ro 160beon-gil
Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18143 / KR
07 / LEE, Min-Jung
105-1901
53 Yeongtong-ro 514beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16712 / KR
08 / SUNG, Hyun-Jung
136-2003
22 Kyeongsudae-ro 976beon-gil
Jangan-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16295 / KR
09 / MOON, Jun-Hwan
108-604
14 Geumhwa-ro 82beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17072 / KR
10 / SONG, Seung-Hyun
103-103
54 Giheung-ro 38beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16975 / KR
11 / LEE, Hyung-Keun
603
Hanyangsoojain Apt.
23 Seoun-ro 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06727 / KR
12 / CHOI, Ji-Hoon
605-703
11-22 Seocheondong-ro 21beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17106 / KR
13 / PARK, Cheon-Hyoung
104-1304
348 Baekjegobun-ro
Songpa-gu
Seoul 05684 / KR
14 / KIM, Yoon-jung
201-401
15 Geumhwa-ro 11beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17073 / KR
15 / KIM, Jin-hyuk
5-6 Yonggu-daero 1900beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17074 / KR
 [2019/32]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[2021/32]
Former [2019/32]Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date17856810.128.09.2017
[2019/32]
WO2017KR10896
Priority number, dateUS201662400694P28.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662400694 P
[2019/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018062924
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3519387
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3519387
Date:11.08.2021
Language:EN
[2021/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:C07D211/70, C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D401/10, C07D405/10, C07D409/10, C07D413/10, A61K31/4418, A61P31/04
[2020/20]
CPC:
C07D211/70 (EP,KR,RU,US); A61K31/4418 (KR,RU); A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP); A61P31/04 (EP,RU); A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US); C07D401/06 (EP,US); C07D401/10 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,US); C07D409/10 (EP,US); C07D413/10 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/32]C07D211/70, C07D401/10, A61K31/4418
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TETRAHYDROPYRIDINDERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ANTIBAKTERIELLE MITTEL[2019/32]
English:TETRAHYDROPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS[2019/32]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE TÉTRAHYDROPYRIDINE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANTIBACTÉRIENS[2019/32]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2019National basic fee paid 
04.04.2019Search fee paid 
04.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
27.10.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.04.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2021Fee for grant paid
29.06.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.05.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.09.2017
AL11.08.2021
CY11.08.2021
CZ11.08.2021
DK11.08.2021
EE11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
MC11.08.2021
MK11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
SI11.08.2021
SK11.08.2021
SM11.08.2021
LU28.09.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU28.09.2017
AL11.08.2021
CY11.08.2021
CZ11.08.2021
DK11.08.2021
EE11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
MC11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
SI11.08.2021
SK11.08.2021
SM11.08.2021
LU28.09.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2023/30]AL11.08.2021
CY11.08.2021
CZ11.08.2021
DK11.08.2021
EE11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
MC11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
SI11.08.2021
SK11.08.2021
SM11.08.2021
LU28.09.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2022/36]AL11.08.2021
CZ11.08.2021
DK11.08.2021
EE11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
MC11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
SI11.08.2021
SK11.08.2021
SM11.08.2021
LU28.09.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2022/34]AL11.08.2021
CZ11.08.2021
DK11.08.2021
EE11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
MC11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
SK11.08.2021
SM11.08.2021
LU28.09.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2022/27]AL11.08.2021
CZ11.08.2021
DK11.08.2021
EE11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
MC11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
SK11.08.2021
SM11.08.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2022/25]CZ11.08.2021
DK11.08.2021
EE11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
MC11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
SK11.08.2021
SM11.08.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2022/24]CZ11.08.2021
DK11.08.2021
EE11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
SK11.08.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2022/21]DK11.08.2021
FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2022/10]FI11.08.2021
HR11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
LV11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
IS11.12.2021
Former [2022/09]FI11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
RS11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
Former [2022/08]FI11.08.2021
LT11.08.2021
SE11.08.2021
BG11.11.2021
NO11.11.2021
Former [2022/07]LT11.08.2021
NO11.11.2021
Documents cited:Search[AP]WO2017098440  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP DEV LTD [GB]) [AP] 1-10* claim 1 *
International search[A]US2004229864  (BOURRAIN SYLVIE [GB], et al) [A] 1-4, 9, 10 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]WO2009008905  (PANTHERA BIOPHARMA LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 9, 10 * See the whole document. *;
 [X]WO2011045703  (PFIZER [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 9, 10 * See page 3, lines 21-22; page 4, lines 14-15; and claims 1, 13, 15. *;
 [X]WO2013170165  (ACHAOGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-4, 9, 10 * See compounds 62, 63; claims 22, 30-32. *;
 [A]WO2015173329  (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH]) [A] 1-4, 9, 10 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]  - GAO, N. et al., "Overexpression of Pseudomonas aeruginosa LpxC with its inhibitors in an acrB-deficient Escherichia coli strain", Protein Expression and Purification, (20140000), vol. 104, pages 57 - 64, XP055337356 [A] 1-4, 9, 10 * See the whole document. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2014.09.006
by applicant   - Rev. Biochem, (20070000), vol. 76, pages 295 - 329
    - "Methods for dilution antimicrobial susceptibility tests for bacteria that grow aerobiocally", NATIONAL COMMITTEE FOR CLINICAL LABORATORY STANDARDS, NCCLS document M7-M5, (20000000), vol. 20
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.