blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3519716

EP3519716 - OVERTRAVEL RELIEF ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS SPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2023Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.07.2023  [2023/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dadco, Inc.
43850 Plymouth Oaks Boulevard
Plymouth, MI 48170 / US
[2019/32]
Inventor(s)01 / COTTER, Jonathan P.
23731 Marshall St.
Dearborn, MI 48124 / US
 [2020/15]
Former [2019/32]01 / COTTER, Jonathan, P.
23731 Marshall St.
Dearborn, MI 48124 / US
Representative(s)HWP Intellectual Property
Ridlerstraße 35
80339 München / DE
[2019/32]
Application number, filing date17857273.126.09.2017
[2019/32]
WO2017US53404
Priority number, dateUS201662401603P29.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662401603 P
US20171570703818.09.2017         Original published format: US201715707038
[2019/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018064026
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3519716
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3519716
Date:16.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.2019
ClassificationIPC:F16F7/12, F16F9/00, F16F9/02, F16F9/04, F16F9/06, F16F9/10, F16F9/32, F16F9/43
[2019/38]
CPC:
F16F9/432 (EP,KR,US); F16F9/0218 (EP,KR,US); F16F9/0281 (KR,US);
F16F2222/126 (KR,US); F16F2230/0023 (KR,US); F16F2230/24 (EP,KR,US)
Former IPC [2019/32]F16F7/12, F16F9/00, F16F9/02, F16F9/04, F16F9/06, F16F9/10, F16F9/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NACHLAUFENTLASTUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE GASFEDER[2019/32]
English:OVERTRAVEL RELIEF ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS SPRING[2019/32]
French:ENSEMBLE DE SOULAGEMENT DE SURCOURSE POUR RESSORT À GAZ[2019/32]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2019National basic fee paid 
27.03.2019Search fee paid 
27.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
03.03.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2020Fee for grant paid
07.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)17.06.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.09.2017
AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CY16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
MK16.09.2020
MT16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
TR16.09.2020
NL23.09.2020
IE26.09.2020
LU26.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
[2023/29]
Former [2022/33]HU26.09.2017
AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CY16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
MK16.09.2020
MT16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
TR16.09.2020
IE26.09.2020
LU26.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2022/27]HU26.09.2017
AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CY16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
MT16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
TR16.09.2020
IE26.09.2020
LU26.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/37]AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
DK16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
IE26.09.2020
LU26.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/36]AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SI16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
LU26.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/31]AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
MC16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
LU26.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/28]AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SK16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
LU26.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/27]AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
LU26.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/25]AL16.09.2020
AT16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
PL16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
IS16.01.2021
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/23]AT16.09.2020
CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ16.09.2020
EE16.09.2020
FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
RO16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
SM16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/21]FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
PT18.01.2021
Former [2021/20]FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LT16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI16.09.2020
HR16.09.2020
LV16.09.2020
RS16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
GR17.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI16.09.2020
BG16.12.2020
NO16.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI16.09.2020
NO16.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]US5303906  (COTTER JONATHAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 41 - line 59; figure 1 * * column 6, line 29 - column 7, line 56; figures 9, 10 *;
 [A]US6086059  (RUNESSON JOHAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 30 - line 51; figure 1 ** column 3, line 26 - line 49; figures 2b-2d *
International search[A]EP1241373  (BARNES GROUP SWITZERLAND GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-17 * 1 see machine translation *;
 [A]US2016032999  (CAPPELLER AUGUSTO [IT], et al) [A] 1-17* entire 1 document *;
 [A]US9291265  (CAPPELLER AUGUSTO [IT], et al) [A] 1-17 * entire document 1 *;
 [A]US9347510  (COTTER JONATHAN P [US]) [A] 1-17 * entire document 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.