Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3518753

EP3518753 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BIOLOGICAL METRICS MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - extension statespublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spry Health, Inc.
235 Alma Street
Palo Alto, California 94025 / US
[2019/32]
Inventor(s)01 / FERBER, Elad
3573 Tripp Road
Woodside California 94062 / US
02 / DEKELAITA, Andrew
c/o Spry Health Inc.
235 Alma Street
Palo Alto California 94301 / US
03 / NARAYANAN, Ramkrishnan
1448 Courtyard Drive
San Jose California 95118 / US
04 / COBUT, Pierre-Jean Julien Ghislain
840 Coleman Avenue No. 13
Menlo Park California 94025 / US
 [2019/32]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/32]
Application number, filing date17857357.227.09.2017
[2019/32]
WO2017US53800
Priority number, dateUS201662400456P27.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662400456 P
[2019/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018064211
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3518753
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/02, A61B5/024
[2019/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG BIOLOGISCHER METRIKEN[2019/32]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BIOLOGICAL METRICS MEASUREMENT[2019/32]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE MESURE DE MÉTRIQUE BIOLOGIQUE[2019/32]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2019National basic fee paid 
29.04.2019Search fee paid 
29.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
26.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2016103648  (KYOCERA CORPORATION) [X] 1, 5-7, 9, 11, 12, 16-19, 21 * , para [0051], [0063], [0089], [0110], [0112], [0119] * [Y] 2, 3, 13, 14;
 [X]WO2016003268  (SCINT B.V.) [X] 1, 4, 8, 10, 12, 15, 20 * , pg. 7, In 1-9; pg. 9, In 1-16; pg. 14, In 27-30; pg. 15, In 5-23; pg. 16, In 14-23; pg. 21, In 18-29; pg. 31, In 7-30; *;
 [Y]US2016242700  (ECHO LABS, INC.) [Y] 2, 3, 13, 14 * , para [0011] . *;
 [EX]US2017332923  (KYOCERA CORPORATION) [EX] 1, 5-7, 9, 11, 12, 16-19, 21 * , para [0051], [0063], [0089], [0110], [0112], [0119] *;
 [A]US2006224054  (MORIYA et al.) [A] 1-21 * , entire document *