Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3524528

EP3524528 - NEAR SPACE AIRCRAFT POD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haikou Institute Of Future Technology
Building A of Haikou National High-Tech Zone
Entrepreneurship Incubation Center
No. 6 of Medicine Valley No. 1 Road
South China Sea Avenue
Haikou, Hainan 570100 / CN
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Ruopeng
Software Building
No. 9 Gaoxinzhong 1st Road
High-Tech Industrial Estate
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / LUAN, Lin
Software Building
No. 9 Gaoxinzhong 1st Road
High-Tech Industrial Estate
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / FENG, Fan
Software Building
No. 9 Gaoxinzhong 1st Road
High-Tech Industrial Estate
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / YAO, Xiaohui
Software Building
No. 9 Gaoxinzhong 1st Road
High-Tech Industrial Estate
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
05 / ZENG, Shequan
Software Building
No. 9 Gaoxinzhong 1st Road
High-Tech Industrial Estate
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date17857781.306.07.2017
[2019/33]
WO2017CN92010
Priority number, dateCN20161088164009.10.2016         Original published format: CN201610881640
[2019/33]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018064900
Date:12.04.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3524528
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN12.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:B64D47/00
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GONDEL EINES FLUGZEUGS FÜR DAS NAHE WELTALL[2019/33]
English:NEAR SPACE AIRCRAFT POD[2019/33]
French:NACELLE D'AÉRONEF EN ESPACE PROCHE[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2019Translation filed 
04.04.2019National basic fee paid 
04.04.2019Search fee paid 
04.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]CN103115444  (HANGZHOU BOILER GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , description, paragraph [0021], and figures 1 and 2 *;
 [A]CN205314809U  (JIANGSU LVNENG ENV PROT INTEGRATION HUTS CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *;
 [A]CN201860049U  (ANHUI XINLONG ELECTRICAL CO) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *;
 [A]CN103270911  (UNIV YANGZHOU) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *;
 [A]CN205319547U  (DONGGUAN CHENYU ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *;
 [A]RU2368463  (AKTSIONERNAJA KHOLDINGOVAJA KO [RU]) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *