Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3525443 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3525443



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 157
28.10.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.10.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 3
28.10.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.10.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
07.10.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
17.07.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.05.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
29.04.2019 Request for a change to the title of the invention Search / examination 1
29.04.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
18.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.04.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.04.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
18.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
18.04.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
18.04.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
18.04.2019 Description Search / examination 23
18.04.2019 Drawings Search / examination 7
18.04.2019 Priority search results Search / examination 7
18.04.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.04.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
15.02.2019 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.04.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
12.04.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.04.2018 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
12.04.2018 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 28